This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/16/2021 at 11:19:51 (UTC).

Rutledge v. Focus on the Family

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 Rutledge filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Focus on the Family. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03402

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessah Rutledge

Defendant

Focus on the Family

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher George Wilhelmi

Defendant Attorney

Kevin M. D'Olivo

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit

#3

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (D'Olivo, Kevin) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin M. D'Olivo on behalf of Focus on the FamilyAttorney Kevin M. D'Olivo added to party Focus on the Family(pty:dft) (D'Olivo, Kevin) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) AMENDED ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/12/2021. Consent Form due by 2/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/8/2021 (evaug ) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order. The deadlines will be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 01/12/21. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order and Magistrate Consent Form by Plaintiff Jessah Rutledge. (Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessah Rutledge. Focus on the Family waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/23/2021. (Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/18/2020. Consent Form due by 1/13/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/13/2021 (evaug ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Focus on the Family (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7591632)Attorney Christopher George Wilhelmi added to party Jessah Rutledge(pty:pla), filed by Jessah Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit)(Wilhelmi, Christopher) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less