This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 07:37:33 (UTC).

Rutledge v. Eli Lilly and Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Rutledge filed an Other lawsuit against Eli Lilly and Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00549

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leslie Rutledge

Defendants

Evernorth Health Inc

Eli Lilly and Company

Novo Nordisk Inc

Sanofi-Aventis US LLC

Express Scripts Holding Company

Express Scripts Inc

Express Scripts Administrators LLC

ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc

Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc

MedCo Health Solutions Inc

CVS Health Corporation

CVS Pharmacy Inc

Caremark Rx LLC

Caremark PCS Health LLC

Caremark LLC

UnitedHealth Group Inc

Optum Inc

OptumRx Inc

OptumRx Holdings LLC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edwin S Gault, Jr.

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39042

Gary B. Rogers

Attorney at Hilburn & Harper LTD

1 Riverfront Place, Eighth Floor

North Little Rock, AR 72119

Kimberly Renteria

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

Shannon L. Halijan

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

Tanya Dearman Ellis

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39042

Walter Garner Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39042

Amanda Denise Land

Attorney at Arkansas Attorney General's Office

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

Gary Rogers

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3700

Little Rock, AR 72201-3645

Kim DuVall Renteria

Catlett-Prien Tower Building

Defendant Attorneys

John Keeling Baker

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Andrew Yaphe

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

James P. Rouhandeh

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Neal A. Potischman

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP

1600 El Camino Real

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Gordon S. Rather, Jr.

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Jessica Pruitt Koehler

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Scott Andrew Irby

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

10809 Executive Center Drive, Suite 205

Little Rock, AR 72211

Theresa Coughlin Martin

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

William D. Coglianese

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

John Polk Talbot

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#57

(#57) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Rutledge.(Rogers, Gary) (Docket text modified on 8/8/2022 to correct description.)(cmn) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#54

(#54) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by All Defendants (Fairley, John) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

#52

(#52) ORDER granting #49 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; and admitting William D. Coglianese to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/26/2022. (llg) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#50

(#50) MOTION to Substitute Attorney 's Firm by Leslie Rutledge (Rogers, Gary) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#49

(#49) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William D. Coglianese. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4313962. Filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Reece Owens on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#5

(#9) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #5 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc.(Baker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#2

(#54) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by All Defendants (Fairley, John) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #57 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Rutledge" as indicated by the document. (cmn) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Rutledge.(Rogers, Gary) (Docket text modified on 8/8/2022 to correct description.)(cmn) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Plaintiff is directed to file the Amended Complaint before 5:00 pm on 8/9/2022. Responses are due forty-five (45) days later. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/5/2022. (sjh) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Leslie Rutledge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redlines)(Rogers, Gary) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by All Defendants (Fairley, John) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/19/2022; Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/3/2022. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/25/2024 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER granting #49 motion to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Separate Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC; and admitting William D. Coglianese to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 07/26/2022. (llg) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #50 Motion to Substitute Attorney's law firm. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/26/2022. (amr) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION to Substitute Attorney 's Firm by Leslie Rutledge (Rogers, Gary) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by William D. Coglianese. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4313962. Filed by Sanofi-Aventis US LLC (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #5 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #1 Notice of Removal notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (cmn) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Reece Owens on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by John Carter Fairley on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Joint Motion) by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc, Caremark LLC, Caremark PCS Health LLC, Caremark Rx LLC (Fairley, John) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Caremark PCS Health LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplemental Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Supplemental Notice of Removal)(Fairley, John) (Docket text modified on 6/15/2022 to correct the party filer) (jak) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc.(Baker, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Leslie Rutledge.(cmn) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, Express Scripts Inc, Express Scripts Pharmacy Inc from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-22-02976. Fee $402 receipt number LIT087106. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OptumRx Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Caremark PCS Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC. is a litigant