This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2020 at 10:15:08 (UTC).

Rutledge et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Rutledge filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr, Edmund F. Brennan, Jennifer L. Thurston and Anthony W. Ishii. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00787

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Morrison C. England, Jr

Anthony W. Ishii

Referral Judges

Edmund F. Brennan

Jennifer L. Thurston

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donald Rutledge

Clara Mae Rutledge

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher A. Gomez, PHV

Attorney at Kline & Specter

1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Michelle L. Tiger, NCAED

Attorney at Kline & Specter

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Lee B. Balefsky, PHV

Attorney at Kline & Specter, P.C.

The Eighteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Peter Lawrence Kaufman

Attorney at Panish Shea & Boyle, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Lee B. Balefsky, NCAED

Attorney at Kline & Specter, P.C.

The Eighteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

David B. Thomas, NCAED

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Kari L. Sutherland, NCAED

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

Susan M. Robinson, NCAED

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

P.O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Melissa A. Merk, NCAED

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

Suite 2000, One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William M. Gage, NCAED

Attorney at Butler Snow

P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Christy D. Jones, NCAED

Attorney at Butler Snow

P.O. Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Joshua James Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower St., Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

Aggie Lee

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mollie Fleming Benedict

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

 

Court Documents

#54

53 #1

Proposed Order

#53

#52

50 #1

Proposed Order

49 #12

Exhibit K

49 #11

Exhibit J

48 #1

Proposed Order

#48

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

258 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) ORDER GRANTING #53 Application of Lee Balefsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/16/2020. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Clara Mae Rutledge, Donald Rutledge for attorney Lee B. Balefsky to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8891855) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) PRO HAC VICE ORDER Added Christopher Gomez Representing Plaintiffs signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/13/2020. (Flores, E) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/13/2020: The motion to withdraw as attorney of record by Michelle L. Tiger (Doc. #48 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to update the docket accordingly. (Hall, S) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Clara Mae Rutledge, Donald Rutledge for attorney Christopher A. Gomez to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kaufman, Peter Lawrence added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8887807) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appendices A and B, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Benedict, Mollie) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY of Michelle Tiger by Clara Mae Rutledge, Donald Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) Modified on 5/13/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER Granting Application for Substitution of Attorney signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/30/2020. Joshua James Wes, Aggie Lee for Ethicon, Inc., Joshua James Wes, Aggie Lee for Johnson & Johnson in place of attorney Melissa A. Merk, NCAED; Susan M. Robinson, NCAED; Kari L. Sutherland, NCAED; David B. Thomas, NCAED; William M. Gage, NCAED and Christy D. Jones, NCAED.(Flores, E) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING Matter and ORDER for Parties to Submit Status Information signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/28/2020. New Case Number: 2:20-cv-787 AWI-JLT. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Court received the Application for Substitution of Attorney and Proposed Order (ECF No. 43). Pursuant to Local Rule 137(b), regarding the requirements for proper filing of a proposed order, you are required to email the proposed order (in Microsoft Word) to chambers in addition to filing the pdf version via the CM/ECF system. Pursuant to Local Rules 101 and 131(c), the definition for "signature", you may enter /s/ for signatures for all counsel. Please submit your proposed order today in Microsoft Word format to: mceorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Deutsch, S) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Clara Mae Rutledge on May 22, 2018 at 2:00 PM (Merk, Melissa) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re: #7 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 03/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Larry Bowen on 4/26/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Clara Mae Rutledge, Donald Rutledge. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 09/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 08/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 181 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 06/10/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3942583. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm) [Transferred from wvsd on 4/17/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua J Wes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mollie Fleming Benedict