Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 07:04:41 (UTC).

RUTKOWSKI et al v. PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 RUTKOWSKI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02849

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL M. BAYLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATHAN RUTKOWSKI

MARTIN HARPER

Defendants

PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.

PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BENJAMIN F. JOHNS

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

361 W. Lancaster Ave

Haverford, PA 19041

ANDREW FERICH

Attorney at Chimicles Schwartz Kriner & Donaldson-Smith LLP

361 West Lancaster Avenue

Haverford, PA 19041

ALEX M. KASHURBA

Attorney at CHIMICLES SCHWARTZ KRINER & DONALD-SMITH LLP

361 W Lancaster Ave

Haverford, PA 19041

Defendant Attorneys

THOMAS S. GIOTTO

Attorney at BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY PC

One Oxford Centre, 20Th Floor, 301 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-6498

ELIZABETH A. MALLOY

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market Street, Suite 2800

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI As To PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/23/2019 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/24/2019. 7/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. GIOTTO on behalf of PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. with Certificate of Service(GIOTTO, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware filed under case number 19-11626 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MALLOY, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim Porvaznik re: served Complaint and Summons directed to Philadelphia Energy Solutions Refining & Marketing, L.L.C. upon Patricia Lawson by Personal Service on July 3, 2019 (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim Porvaznik re: served Complaint and Summons directed to Philadelphia Energy Solutions, L.L.C. upon Patricia Lawson by Personal Service on July 3, 2019 (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX M. KASHURBA on behalf of MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI (KASHURBA, ALEX) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW FERICH on behalf of MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI (FERICH, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13638764.), filed by NATHAN RUTKOWSKI, MARTIN HARPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(lisad, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI As To PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME UP TO AND INCLUDING 8/23/2019 TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/24/2019. 7/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS S. GIOTTO on behalf of PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. with Certificate of Service(GIOTTO, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware filed under case number 19-11626 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MALLOY, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim Porvaznik re: served Complaint and Summons directed to Philadelphia Energy Solutions Refining & Marketing, L.L.C. upon Patricia Lawson by Personal Service on July 3, 2019 (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Tim Porvaznik re: served Complaint and Summons directed to Philadelphia Energy Solutions, L.L.C. upon Patricia Lawson by Personal Service on July 3, 2019 (JOHNS, BENJAMIN) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALEX M. KASHURBA on behalf of MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI (KASHURBA, ALEX) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW FERICH on behalf of MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI (FERICH, ANDREW) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARTIN HARPER, NATHAN RUTKOWSKI. (ahf) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Summons Issued as to PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/28/2019 (ahf) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, L.L.C., PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13638764.), filed by NATHAN RUTKOWSKI, MARTIN HARPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(lisad, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILADELPHIA ENERGY SOLUTIONS REFINING AND MARKETING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH A. MALLOY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas S. Giotto