This case was last updated from PACER on 08/27/2019 at 08:02:38 (UTC).

RUTHRAUFF v. DROZDOWSKI et al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 RUTHRAUFF filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DROZDOWSKI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon, Doris L. Pryor and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judges

Doris L. Pryor

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK RUTHRAUFF

Defendants

JULIAN DROZDOWSKI

FTI Holdings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel John McGlone

Attorney at MCGLONE LAW

1717 South 3Rd Street

Terre Haute, IN 47802

Defendant Attorneys

Lesley A. Pfleging

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Katherine Lee English

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200, Indianapolis

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A - Demand Letter

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Putnam Circuit Court, case number 67C01-1905-CT-000291, filed by FTI Holdings. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504534) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 State Court Record Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Appearance, Jury Demand, Motion for Enlargement of Time, and Order on Motion for Enlargement of Time, Summons, and Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Record Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Summons, Certificate of Issua

1 #2

Exhibit B - Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by MARK RUTHRAUFF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGlone, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

(#19) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Court will enter Case Management Order by separate order. Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is hereby VACATED. Discovery shall commence immediately. Plaintiff shall file overdue response to the Notice of Removal, as required by Local Rule 81-1(b), on or before August 28, 2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:19-cv-00309-JPH-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DMW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore for all further proceedings. This case is related to 2:19-cv-308. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/21/2019. (PKP) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Consolidation, filed by Defendants JULIAN DROZDOWSKI, FTI HOLDINGS (English, Katherine) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by MARK RUTHRAUFF. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGlone, Daniel) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2020. Discovery due by 6/19/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Court will enter Case Management Order by separate order. Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is hereby VACATED. Discovery shall commence immediately. Plaintiff shall file overdue response to the Notice of Removal, as required by Local Rule 81-1(b), on or before August 28, 2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time). Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2020 at 9:00 AM (Eastern Time). *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (GD) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS - In the event an agreed protective order is required in this matter, the parties shall file a motion seeking the entry of such an order, attaching thereto the proposed protective order. A motion for the entry of an agreed protective order should be filed as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than 14 days prior to the original due date for any discovery response with regard to which the responding party proposes to rely upon the protective order when responding. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 8/21/2019. (DMW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 2:19-cv-00309-JPH-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (DMW) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore for all further proceedings. This case is related to 2:19-cv-308. Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/21/2019. (PKP) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Consolidation, filed by Defendants JULIAN DROZDOWSKI, FTI HOLDINGS (English, Katherine) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by All Defendants.(Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant JULIAN DROZDOWSKI. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 11:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor.The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019.(RSF) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses, filed by FTI HOLDINGS.(Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FTI HOLDINGS identifying Corporate Parent 8815623 Canada Inc. for FTI HOLDINGS.. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to July 26, 2019 , filed by Defendant FTI HOLDINGS. (English, Katherine) Modified on 7/3/2019 to edit docket text (DMW). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DMW) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DMW) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A. Pfleging on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (Pfleging, Lesley) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Lee English on behalf of Defendant FTI Holdings. (English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Putnam Circuit Court, case number 67C01-1905-CT-000291, filed by FTI Holdings. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5504534) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 State Court Record Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Appearance, Jury Demand, Motion for Enlargement of Time, and Order on Motion for Enlargement of Time, Summons, and Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(English, Katherine) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.