This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2021 at 10:57:30 (UTC).

Russo v. PNC Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Russo filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against PNC Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00025

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Paul G. Byron

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Appellant and In Re

Lilia Belkova Russo

Loxahatchee, FL 33470

Appellee

PNC Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Kimberly H. Isreal

Attorney at McGlinchey Staffore

10407 Centurion Parkway, North, Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Kimberly Held Israel

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC

Suite 200, 10407 Centurion Parkway N.

Jacksonville, FL 32256

 

Court Documents

15 #124

3-20-bk-2204_Transcript_Hearing_November_19_2020

15 #123

3-20-bk-2204_Transcript_Hearing_December_16_2020

15 #122

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000102_Notice_of_Appeal_With_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_and_Order_F

15 #121

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000090_Order_Granting_PNC_Bank,N.A.'s_Motion_for_Prosp

15 #120

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_Written_Request_for_the_Transcript_

15 #119

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000082_Appeal_Cover_Sheet

15 #76

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_15_Exhibit_N

15 #75

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_14_Exhibit_M

15 #74

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_13_Exhibit_L

15 #73

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_12_Exhibit_K

15 #72

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_11_Exhibit_J

15 #71

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_10_Exhibit_I

15 #70

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_9_Exhibit_H

15 #44

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_7_Exhibit_F

15 #43

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_6_Exhibit_E

15 #42

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_5_Exhibit_D

15 #41

3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_4_Exhibit_C

15 #1

3-20-bk-2204_2Notice of Appeal

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Lilia Belkova Russo. (Attachments: #1 3-20-bk-2204_2Notice of Appeal, #2 3-20-bk-2204_3Order_Granting_PNC Bank, N.A.'s_Motion_for_Prospective_In-Rem_Relief_from_Automatic_Stay, #3 3-20-bk-2204_4Statement_of_Issues_on_Appeal, #4 3-20-bk-2204_5Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal, #5 3-20-bk-2204_6Docket, #6 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_1-1, #7 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_1-2, #8 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_2-1, #9 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_3-1, #10 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_3-2, #11 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_4-1, #12 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_4-2, #13 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_5-1, #14 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_6-1, #15 3-20-bk-2204_Claim_7-1, #16 3-20-ap-180_Docket_000050_Motion_to_Compel_Defendant_to_Produce_the_Original_Promissory_Note_for_Inspection_by_Forensic_Expert, #17 3-20-ap-180_Docket_000068_Order_Denying_Debtor's_Motion_to_Compel_Production_from_PNC_Bank, #18 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_12_Installments, #19 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000008_Notice_of_Bankruptcy_Case__Section_341, #20 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000018_Schedules_A_-_J_and_Summary_of_Assets, #21 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000023_Chapter_12_Plan_Filed_by_Debtor_Lilia_Belkova_Russo, #22 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000024_Amended_Summary_of_Assets_Amended_Schedules_Schedule_ABSchedule_DSchedule_EF_Includ, #23 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000027_Notice_of_Chapter_12_Confirmation_Hearing, #24 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_1_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_Or_For_Prospective_Relief_From_Stay_Filed_by_Peter_W_Kelly_on_beha, #25 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #26 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #27 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #28 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #29 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #30 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_7_Exhibit_F, #31 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_8_Exhibit_G, #32 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_9_Exhibit_H, #33 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_10_Exhibit_I, #34 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_11_Exhibit_J, #35 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_12_Exhibit_K, #36 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000031_Part_13_Exhibit_L, #37 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000033_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_Or_For_Prospective_Relief_From_Stay_Filed_by_P, #38 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_1_Joinder_in_the_Motion_by_Deer_Run_Property_Owners_Association_Inc_for_Order_of_Dismissa, #39 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #40 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #41 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #42 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #43 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #44 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_7_Exhibit_F, #45 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_8_Exhibit_G, #46 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_9_Exhibit_H, #47 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_10_Exhibit_I, #48 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_11_Exhibit_J, #49 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_12_Exhibit_K, #50 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_13_Exhibit_L, #51 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_14_Exhibit_M, #52 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_15_Exhibit_N, #53 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_16_Exhibit_O, #54 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_17_Exhibit_P, #55 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_18_Exhibit_Q, #56 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_19_Exhibit_R, #57 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_20_Exhibit_S, #58 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_21_Exhibit_T, #59 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_22_Exhibit_U, #60 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_23_Exhibit_V, #61 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000034_Part_24_Exhibit_W, #62 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_1_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Debtors_Chapter_12_Plan_Filed_by_Kimberly_H_Israel_on_behalf, #63 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #64 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #65 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #66 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #67 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #68 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_7_Exhibit_F, #69 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_8_Exhibit_G, #70 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_9_Exhibit_H, #71 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_10_Exhibit_I, #72 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_11_Exhibit_J, #73 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_12_Exhibit_K, #74 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_13_Exhibit_L, #75 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_14_Exhibit_M, #76 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_15_Exhibit_N, #77 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_16_Exhibit_O, #78 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_17_Exhibit_P, #79 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_18_Exhibit_Q, #80 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_19_Exhibit_R, #81 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_20_Exhibit_S, #82 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_21_Exhibit_T, #83 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000036_Part_22_Exhibit_U, #84 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000037_Joinder_Motion_by_Deer_Run_Property_Owners_Association_Inc_for_Order_of_Dismissal_with, #85 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000038_Joinder_Amended_Notice_of_Joining_Motion_by_Deer_Run_Property_Owners_Association_Inc_fo, #86 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000039_Objection_to_Confirmation_of_Plan_Filed_by_Peter_W_Kelly_on_behalf_of_Creditor_Deer_Run_Pr, #87 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000040_Amended_Chapter_12_Plan_with_Certificate_of_Service_Filed_by_Debtor_Lilia_Belkova_Russo, #88 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000041_Chaper_12_Trustee's_Objection_to_Confirmation, #89 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000042_Second_Amended_Chaper_12_Plan, #90 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000043_Objection_to_Claim, #91 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000045_Objection_to_Claim, #92 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000046_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #93 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000047_Objection_to_Claim, #94 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000048_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #95 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000049_Objection_to_Claim, #96 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000050_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #97 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000051_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #98 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000052_Objection_to_Claim, #99 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000054_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Claim, #100 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000055_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_TELEPHONIC_APPEARANCES_Lilia_Belkova_Russo_Pro_S, #101 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000056_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Dismiss_Case_and_Imposing_a_Bar_to_Future_Filings_for_a_Period_of, #102 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000064_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Prospective_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay, #103 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000066_Motion_for_Prospective_Relief_from_Stay, #104 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000067_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Prospective_Relief_from_Stay_Filed_by_Kimberly, #105 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000068_Notice_of_Appeal, #106 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000069_Corrective_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Debtor_Lilia_Be, #107 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000073_Notice_of_Deficient_Filing_Appeal_Cover_Sheet, #108 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000074_Service_of_Previously_Entered_OrderNotice_via_Bankruptcy_Noticing_Center_Title_of_Previo, #109 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000075_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #110 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_1_Objection_to_Motion_for_Prospective_in_rem_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay_and_Request_for, #111 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #112 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #113 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #114 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #115 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000077_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #116 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000078_Amended_Objection_to_Claim, #117 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000079_Motion_to_File_Supplemental_Objection_to_Creditor_PNC_Bank_NAs_Motion_for_Prospective, #118 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000080_Objection_to_Creditor_PNC_Bank_NAs_Motion_for_Prospective_In_Rem_Relief_From_Automatic, #119 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000082_Appeal_Cover_Sheet, #120 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000087_Notice_of_Filing_Written_Request_for_the_Transcript_Filed_by_Debtor_Lilia_Belkova_Russo, #121 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000090_Order_Granting_PNC_Bank,N.A.'s_Motion_for_Prospective_Relief, #122 3-20-bk-2204_Docket_000102_Notice_of_Appeal_With_Appeal_Cover_Sheet_and_Order_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_F, #123 3-20-bk-2204_Transcript_Hearing_December_16_2020, #124 3-20-bk-2204_Transcript_Hearing_November_19_2020)(CP) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 5:20-cv-00619-TJC. (LMF) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting Appellee PNC Bank, N.A.'s motions to consolidate Appellant's two appellate cases, Case No. 5:20-cv-619-Oc-32 and Case No. 5:21-cv-25-Oc-32. Case No. 5:21-cv-25-Oc-32 shall be consolidated with Case No. 5:20-cv-619-Oc-32. The Clerk should administratively close Case No. 5:21-cv-25-Oc-32. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/29/2021. (TNM) Modified on 2/1/2021 (LMF). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Lilia Belkova Russo. (LMF) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lilia Belkova Russo. Related case(s): yes. (LMF) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amended CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #4 Interested persons order by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent PNC Bancorp, Inc. for PNC Bank, N.A... (Israel, Kimberly) Modified on 1/28/2021 (HAI). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Lilia Belkova Russo. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order Extending Time to File Designation)(CP) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case Reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. New case number: 5:21-cv-25-Oc-32. Judge Paul G. Byron no longer assigned to the case. (LMF) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Chief Judge Timothy J. Corrigan, with his consent, pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(a). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/21/2021. (CPH) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by PNC Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): yes (Israel, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/13/2021. (GNB) copies mailed (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/13/2021. (GNB) copies mailed (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 1/12/2021. (LMF) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Lilia Belkova Russo. Bankruptcy Court case number 3:20-bk-02204-RCT. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Order Appealed)(LMF) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Held Israel