This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:02:21 (UTC).

Russo v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Russo filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03401

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Russo

Defendant

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel S. Coen

Attorney at Springer Ayeni, A Professional Law Corporation

1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1100

Oakland, CA 94612

Claire Kennedy-Wilkins

Attorney at Springer Ayeni, A Professional Law Corp.

1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1100

Oakland, CA 94612

Cassie Springer Ayeni

Attorney at Springer Ayeni, A Professional Law Corporation

1901 Harrison St., Suite 1100

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

Rebecca A. Hull

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Mark Russo. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ***ERROR IN FILING PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #12 FOR CORRECT FILING. *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Russo. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/26/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint byHartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 10/7/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Russo. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13437998.). Filed byMark Russo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Russo.. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

10 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Russo (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/31/2019) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint byHartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Mark Russo. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/10/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Russo. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #11 (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 7/10/2019) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ***ERROR IN FILING PER FILER. SEE DOCKET #12 FOR CORRECT FILING. *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Russo. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/26/2019) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 10/7/2019 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Russo.. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/28/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Mark Russo (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13437998.). Filed byMark Russo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coen, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2019) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.