This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2021 at 07:30:55 (UTC).

Russell v. Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 Russell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Stanley Black Decker, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Franklin U. Valderrama and Heather K. McShain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04954

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Franklin U. Valderrama

Referral Judge

Heather K. McShain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elaine Russell

Defendant

Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Kezelis

Attorney at French, Kezelis & Kominiarek, P.C.

33 North Dearborn Streetsuite 700

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Kopon, Jr.

Attorney at Kopon Airdo, LLC

111 East Wacker Drivesuite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

Amanda J. Walsh

Attorney at Kopon Airdo, LLC

111 E. Wacker Drivesuite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/01/2021 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

7 #1

Joint Status Report

#8

(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (mp, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge Heather K. McShain. The joint status report deadline set in R. 7 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#10

(#10) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice. (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters #10 . A joint status report is due on 11/01/2021 to update the Court on: (a) a proposed schedule for the completion of fact discovery, including proposed dates for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, the issuance of written discovery requests, and the completion of fact discovery; (b) a statement whether expert and/or ESI discovery is anticipated; (c) the status of settlement negotiations, if any; and (d) any other issues the parties wish to raise with the Court. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge McShain for discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters #10 . A joint status report is due on 11/01/2021 to update the Court on: (a) a proposed schedule for the completion of fact discovery, including proposed dates for Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, the issuance of written discovery requests, and the completion of fact discovery; (b) a statement whether expert and/or ESI discovery is anticipated; (c) the status of settlement negotiations, if any; and (d) any other issues the parties wish to raise with the Court. Mailed notice (lxs, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAILED copy of Minute Entry #9 and Order Referring a Civil Case to the Designated Magistrate Judge #10 to Counsel Robert A. Kezelis. (axc). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Heather K. McShain for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters. (axc) Mailed notice. (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: The Court refers discovery supervision, including setting all deadlines, and settlement matters to Magistrate Judge Heather K. McShain. The joint status report deadline set in R. 7 is hereby stricken. Mailed notice (axc). (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (mp, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: On or before 12/01/2021 the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Valderrama's name and then again on the link entitled 'Joint Initial Status Report. Plaintiff must serve this Minute Entry on all other parties. If the defendant(s) has not been served with process by that date, plaintiff's counsel is instructed to file an individual status report indicating the status of service of process by the same deadline. The parties are further ordered to review all of Judge Valderrama's standing orders and the information available on his webpage. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Report) (axc). (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint Stanley Black & Decker's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint at Law by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.(Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JURY Demand (Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. by Andrew Kopon, Jr Appearance AJW (Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. by Andrew Kopon, Jr (Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ak, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal filed by Stanley Black & Decker, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18681443. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kopon, Andrew) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STANLEY BLACK & DECKER INC. A CONNECTICUT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Kopon, Jr.