Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/18/2020 at 08:01:04 (UTC).

Russell v. Parallon Enterprises

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 Russell filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Parallon Enterprises. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark Waddoups. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00103

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clark Waddoups

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendi L. Russell

Defendant

Parallon Enterprises

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J. Holdsworth

9125 S Monroe Plaza Way Ste C

Sandy, UT 84070

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet 1

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Parallon Enterprises (Originally received by the court on 2/18/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Wendi L. Russell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (nl) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/19/2020. (nl) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Parallon Enterprises (Originally received by the court on 2/18/2020). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Wendi L. Russell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (nl) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/19/2020. (nl) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia Romero for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 02/18/2020) filed by Plaintiff Wendi L. Russell. (tlh) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARRALLON ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J. Holdsworth