This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2022 at 18:43:18 (UTC).

Russell Sigler, Inc. v. Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 Russell Sigler, Inc filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Norman S Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Josephine L. Staton and John D. Early. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01441

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Russell Sigler, Inc.

Respondents

Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC

Adam Helliwell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Carter Lee Norfleet

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

J David Bournazian

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

1 Park Plaza Suite 12Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Jonathan Peter Hersey

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

1 Park Place 12Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Daniel M Glassman

Attorney at K and L Gates LLP

1 Park Plaza Suite 12Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Respondent Attorneys

Gregory A Garbacz

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

2 Park Plaza Suite 1250

Irvine, CA 92614

John T A Rosenthal

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

777 South Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES (Doc. #1 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Petition To Compel Compliance With Arbitrator Summonses (Doc. 1) filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc. against Respondents Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC and Adam Helliwell is dismissed without prejudice with each side bearing its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#27

(#27) MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Denying Motion by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: denying #13 Motion to Compel. Based on the Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court finds the Motion (Dkt. 13) is now moot, DENIES the Motion on that basis, and vacates the hearing on the Motion. (hr) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

13 #6

Proposed Order

13 #5

Exhibit 4 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman

13 #4

Exhibit 3 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman

13 #3

Exhibit 2 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman

13 #2

Exhibit 1 in support of Declaration of Daniel Glassman

13 #1

Declaration of Daniel Glassman

13 #13

Main Document

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Proposed Order

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Declaration of Daniel Glassman

1 #2

Summons to Adam Helliwell

1 #1

Summons to Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern Californi

1 #1

Main Document

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES (Doc. #1 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Petition To Compel Compliance With Arbitrator Summonses (Doc. 1) filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc. against Respondents Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC and Adam Helliwell is dismissed without prejudice with each side bearing its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Denying Motion by Magistrate Judge John D. Early: denying #13 Motion to Compel. Based on the Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court finds the Motion (Dkt. 13) is now moot, DENIES the Motion on that basis, and vacates the hearing on the Motion. (hr) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., re MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 Adam Helliwell served on 9/15/2021. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., re MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC served on 9/15/2021. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adam Helliwell - self in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Russell Sigler, Inc., upon Defendant Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon 'Jane Doe' - Receptionist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Opposition to re: MOTION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH ARBITRATOR SUMMONSES #13 filed by Respondents Adam Helliwell, Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John T. Rosenthal, Esq. in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses, #2 Declaration of Greg A. Garbacz, Esq. in Support of Respondents' Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses)(Attorney John T A Rosenthal added to party Adam Helliwell(pty:res), Attorney John T A Rosenthal added to party Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC(pty:res))(Rosenthal, John) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge John D. Early, Order Denying Ex Parte Motion #17 .(see document for details) (mba) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on to 10/7/2021 #17 filed by Respondents Adam Helliwell, Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration Declaration in support of Response to Motion Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses, #3 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Gregory A Garbacz added to party Adam Helliwell(pty:res), Attorney Gregory A Garbacz added to party Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC(pty:res))(Garbacz, Gregory) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc., (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. The case initiating document such as the Civil Cover Sheet was incorrectly filed as an attachment. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The Summons Requests were filed under the incorrect event. The correct event is: Civil Events > Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Summons Request. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION to Compel Compliance with Arbitrator Summonses Receipt No: ACACDC-31921881 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner Russell Sigler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Norman S. Wright Climatec Mechanical Equipment of Southern California, LLC, #2 Summons to Adam Helliwell, #3 Declaration of Daniel Glassman, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Daniel M Glassman added to party Russell Sigler, Inc.(pty:pet))(Glassman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Russell Sigler Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T.A. Rosenthal