This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 07:45:41 (UTC).

Russell et al v. Klein et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Russell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Klein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06503

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Heidi Russell

Valentina Bajada

Defendants

Katherine Klein

Lawrence Marks

Kate Gladstone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arthur Z Schwartz

Attorney at Advocates for Justice, Chartered Attorneys

225 Broadway, Suite 1902

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Elizabeth Anne Forman

Attorney at NY State Office Of Court Administration

25 Beaver Street

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, voluntarily dismiss their complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/26/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

13 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Arthur Z. Schwartz

#13

(#13) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Arthur Z. Schwartz).(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#11

(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elizabeth A. Forman dated 8/21/20 re: Letter Response to TRO. Document filed by Lawrence Marks..(Forman, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER: As discussed at the hearing held today, Defendant Marks shall file papers responsive to Plaintiffs' TRO application no later than 1:00 p.m. tomorrow. Defendant Klein is invited to do so by the same deadline. The parties shall appear for a continued TRO hearing at 4:00 p.m. tomorrow. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/20/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heidi Russell and Valentina Bajada, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit Ex. H2 - Gladstone Lockout Petition

1 #8

Exhibit Ex. H1 - Gladstone OSC

1 #7

Exhibit Ex. G - Judge Marks' August 12, 2020 Order

1 #6

Exhibit Ex. F -Exec. Order 202.55

1 #5

Exhibit Ex. E - Exec. Order 202.48

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D - Exec. Order 202.28

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C - Exec Order 202.8

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B -Settlement and Judgment of Eviction

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Holdover Petition

#1

***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Plaintiffs, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, voluntarily dismiss their complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/26/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Lewis J. Liman for approval for the following reason(s): pursuant to Rule 41. (km) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketORDER: The hearing scheduled for 4:00PM today has been CANCELLED based on Plaintiff's representation to the Court (via email to Chambers) that they are withdrawing their application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. . Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Arthur Z. Schwartz).(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Plaintiffs counsel has yet to file any motion for TRO on the public docket and has not asked that the motion be sealed. If Plaintiffs motion does not appear on the public docket by 3:00 p.m. today, the Court will cancel the conference scheduled for 4:00 p.m. and will deny the motion. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (MM) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Elizabeth A. Forman dated 8/21/20 re: Letter Response to TRO. Document filed by Lawrence Marks..(Forman, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Telephone Conference held on 8/20/2020 in re: Plaintiff's Application for a TRO. Arthur Schwartz present by telephone for Plaintiffs. Defendant, Katherine Klein, present by telephone. Elizabeth Forman present by telephone for Defendant, Chief Administrative Judge Lawrence Marks and on behalf of NY State Unified Court System. Court reporter present by telephone. (mf) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: As discussed at the hearing held today, Defendant Marks shall file papers responsive to Plaintiffs' TRO application no later than 1:00 p.m. tomorrow. Defendant Klein is invited to do so by the same deadline. The parties shall appear for a continued TRO hearing at 4:00 p.m. tomorrow. They are directed to call (888) 251-2909 and use access code 2123101. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman.) (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/20/2020) (va) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katherine Klein; Lawrence Marks. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Arthur Z Schwartz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lawrence Marks, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Katherine Klein a/k/a Kate Gladstone, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heidi Russell and Valentina Bajada, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Valentina Bajada, Heidi Russell..(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - COMPLAINT against Katherine Klein, Lawrence Marks. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-21176670)Document filed by Heidi Russell, Valentina Bajada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Holdover Petition, #2 Exhibit Ex. B -Settlement and Judgment of Eviction, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Exec Order 202.8, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Exec. Order 202.28, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Exec. Order 202.48, #6 Exhibit Ex. F -Exec. Order 202.55, #7 Exhibit Ex. G - Judge Marks' August 12, 2020 Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. H1 - Gladstone OSC, #9 Exhibit Ex. H2 - Gladstone Lockout Petition).(Schwartz, Arthur) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jgo). (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less