This case was last updated from PACER on 06/04/2020 at 08:28:01 (UTC).

Rusinyak v. New York City School Support Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2020 Rusinyak filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against New York City School Support Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl L. Pollak and Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01698

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl L. Pollak

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Rusinyak

Brooklyn, NY 11228

Defendant

New York City School Support Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Harry Mark Weinberg

Attorney at Law Offices of Harry Weinberg

292 Madison Avenue, 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference has been scheduled for Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 3:45 PM. The conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:45 PM on June 15, 2020. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1698. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/15/2020. (Hazelwood, John) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter re: Status by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report by 6/8/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/6/2020. (Hazelwood, John) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER dated 4/6/20 that plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint by April 20, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/6/2020 ) *Order forwarded for mailing. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

2 #2

Exhibit CBA

2 #1

Exhibit Small Claims Summons and Endorsed Complaint

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Harry Mark Weinberg on behalf of New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Small Claims Summons and Endorsed Complaint, #2 Exhibit CBA) (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New York City School Support Services, Inc. from Civil Court of the City of New York, Kings County, Small Claims Part, case number 651 SCK 2020 1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12634731) (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference has been scheduled for Tuesday, June 16, 2020 at 3:45 PM. The conference will proceed via AT&T conference call. Please dial 877-336-1839 at 3:45 PM on June 15, 2020. Enter Access code: 380-1746 and security code: 20-1698. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/15/2020. (Hazelwood, John) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter re: Status by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties are directed to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report by 6/8/2020. So Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/6/2020. (Hazelwood, John) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER dated 4/6/20 that plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint by April 20, 2020. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/6/2020 ) *Order forwarded for mailing. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan and Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Notice of Removal, by New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by Harry Mark Weinberg on behalf of New York City School Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Small Claims Summons and Endorsed Complaint, #2 Exhibit CBA) (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New York City School Support Services, Inc. from Civil Court of the City of New York, Kings County, Small Claims Part, case number 651 SCK 2020 1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12634731) (Weinberg, Harry) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less