This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2021 at 09:43:51 (UTC).

Rushlow v. Salvo

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 Rushlow filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Salvo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Helen Rushlow

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Carl Salvo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Timothy K. Baldwin

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Caroline R. Thibeault

Attorney at Whelan Corrente & Flanders LLP

100 Westminster Street, Suite 710

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Joshua J. Butera

Attorney at Pannone Lopes Devereaux & O'Gara LLC

1301 Atwood Avenue, Suite 215N

Johnston, RI 02919

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION re #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED NOTICE of HEARING: Mediation will convene on 4/13/2021 at 02:00 PM with the Court-Appointed Mediator. The Mediation will be conducted via the Court's Teleconference Serviec/FaceTime. Dial-In-Instructions will be sent to counsel in advance of the mediation. All persons participating in the Mediation must provide the Mediator in advance of the Mediation with the name, email address and cell phone number of all persons participating in the mediation. In addition, Mediation Statements which are required, must be emailed to the Mediator 5 days in advance of the Mediation. Finally, the "In-Person" requirement set forth in this form Notice is waived due to the Covid-19 Pandemic. (Mitchell, Berry) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Helen Rushlow by Carl Salvo.(Butera, Joshua) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #9 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Carl Salvo answer or responsive pleading due 3/19/21- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/18/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Carl Salvo. (Butera, Joshua) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Carl Salvo answer or responsive pleading due 3/16/2021- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/10/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Carl Salvo. (Butera, Joshua) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua J. Butera on behalf of Carl Salvo (Butera, Joshua) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helen Rushlow. Carl Salvo served on 2/16/2021, answer due 3/9/2021. (Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING:Mediation will convene on 3/31/2021 at 02:00 PM with the Court-Appointed Mediator. The Mediation will be conducted via the Court's Teleconference Serviec/FaceTime. All persons participating in the Mediation must provide the Mediator in advance of the Mediation with the name, email address and cell phone number of the participant. In addition, Mediation Statements which are required, must be emailed to the Mediator 5 days in advance of the Mediation. Finally, the "In-Person" requirement set forth in this form Notice is waived due to the Covid-19 Pandemic. All other requirements set forth in the Notice remain in force and affect. (Mitchell, Berry) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/18/2021. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carl Salvo. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1593132 ), filed by Helen Rushlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carl Salvo. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number 0103-1593132 ), filed by Helen Rushlow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Thibeault, Caroline) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline R. Thibeault

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy K. Baldwin