This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 09:39:30 (UTC).

Rupple v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Rupple filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John A. Gibney, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Gibney, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John G. Rupple, III

Defendants

Equifax Information Service, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Bank of America, National Association

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tara Boen Keller

Attorney at Consumer Litgation Associates PC (Alex)

1800 Diagonal Rd, Suite 600

Alexandria, VA 22314

Matthew James Erausquin

Attorney at Consumer Litgation Associates PC (Alex)

1800 Diagonal Rd, Suite 600

Alexandria, VA 22314

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Robert Ward

Attorney at McCandlish Holton

1111 E Main St, P.O. Box 796, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100, Po Box 796

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

Alexandria Elizabeth Cuff

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point, Po Box 1122

Richmond, VA 23219

John Willard Montgomery, Jr.

Attorney at Traylor Montgomery & Elliott PC

130 E Wythe St

Petersburg, VA 23803

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Equifax and Experian by John G. Rupple, III. (Keller, Tara) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#24

(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/19/19. (wtuc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#23

(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, National Association. (Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, National Association.(Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by John G. Rupple, III (Erausquin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Ward, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by John G. Rupple, III (Erausquin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#18

(#18) CONSENT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank of America, National Association answer due 6/11/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 05/24/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

17 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#9) AGREED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 04/25/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Upon motion of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("BANA"), by counsel, the court grants BANA's Stipulated Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint and ORDERS that the time within which BANA may file pleadings in response to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to May 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 04/24/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time

#5

(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time)(Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John G. Rupple, III as to Bank of America, served 04/05/2019 answer due 04/26/2019; Equifax Information Service, LLC served 04/05/2019 answer due 04/26/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served 04/09/2019 answer due 04/30/2019; Trans Union, LLC served 04/09/2019 answer due 04/30/2019. (Keller, Tara) Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct text. (tjoh, ). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, National Association, Equifax Information Service, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by John G. Rupple, III. (Keller, Tara) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6569065.), filed by John G. Rupple, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Tara) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/1/2019) (tjoh, ). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants Equifax and Experian by John G. Rupple, III. (Keller, Tara) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 6/19/19. (wtuc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, National Association. (Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, National Association.(Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by John G. Rupple, III (Erausquin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Ward, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by John G. Rupple, III (Erausquin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CONSENT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bank of America, National Association answer due 6/11/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 05/24/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Erausquin on behalf of John G. Rupple, III (Erausquin, Matthew) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AGREED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 04/25/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Upon motion of Defendant Bank of America, N.A. ("BANA"), by counsel, the court grants BANA's Stipulated Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint and ORDERS that the time within which BANA may file pleadings in response to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended to May 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 04/24/2019. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond by Bank of America, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time)(Cuff, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John G. Rupple, III as to Bank of America, served 04/05/2019 answer due 04/26/2019; Equifax Information Service, LLC served 04/05/2019 answer due 04/26/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served 04/09/2019 answer due 04/30/2019; Trans Union, LLC served 04/09/2019 answer due 04/30/2019. (Keller, Tara) Modified on 4/19/2019 to correct text. (tjoh, ). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Bank of America, National Association, Equifax Information Service, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Remove header and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons by John G. Rupple, III. (Keller, Tara) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6569065.), filed by John G. Rupple, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Tara) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/1/2019) (tjoh, ). (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant