This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2020 at 09:29:52 (UTC).

RUPP v. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 RUPP filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01392

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TODD RUPP

Defendant

MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald T. Elliott

Attorney at Dillon, McCandless, King, Coulter & Graham

128 West Cunningham Street

Butler, PA 16001

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D. Shope, Jr.

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 401 Liberty Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Henry M. Sneath

Attorney at Houston Harbaugh, P.C.

Three Gateway Center, 401 Liberty Avenue, 22Nd Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TODD RUPP. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shope, Jr on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Shope, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Sneath on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#7

(#7) Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#5

(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/28/2020. (av) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TODD RUPP. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (sdp) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by TODD RUPP (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-591343), filed by TODD RUPP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER striking #13 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. The parties must file an amended ADR Stipulation by 11/13/2020 that includes a set date for the mediation and a representative for defendant. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/9/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TODD RUPP. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 10/22/2020. (sdp) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Shope, Jr on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Shope, Robert) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry M. Sneath on behalf of MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/6/2020. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 9/28/2020. (av) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by TODD RUPP. MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (sdp) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by TODD RUPP (Elliott, Ronald) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MARYLAND OVERPAK CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-591343), filed by TODD RUPP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less