Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2021 at 07:38:38 (UTC).

Rumelhart v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2021 Rumelhart filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael J. McShane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. McShane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Rumelhart

Defendants

Verizon Wireless Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Does 1 through 100 Inclusive

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Merchants Acceptance Corp.

Does 1 through 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle W. Schumacher

Po Box 558

Spring Branch, TX 78070

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine A. Neben

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive, Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612

Samantha K. Sondag

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Jeffrey M. Edelson

Attorney at Markowitz Herbold PC

1455 Sw Broadway, Suite 1900

Portland, OR 97201

Jeffrey I. Hasson

Attorney at Hasson Law, LLC

9385 Sw Locust Street

Tigard, OR 97223

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8033467. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#18

(#18) Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by Jeffrey Rumelhart. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#17

(#17) Notice of Settlement Filed by Jeffrey Rumelhart. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#15

(#15) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#10

(#10) Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#9

(#9) Return of Service Executed as to Merchants Acceptance Corp. served on 3/5/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Merchants Acceptance Corp.. (Hasson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey I. Hasson appearing on behalf of Merchants Acceptance Corp. Filed by on behalf of Merchants Acceptance Corp.. (Hasson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Merchants Acceptance Corp. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/16/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/16/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #19 requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8033467 #19 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ck) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Katherine A. Neben. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8033467. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by Jeffrey Rumelhart. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Settlement Filed by Jeffrey Rumelhart. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Sondag, Samantha) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Edelson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/5/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Executed as to Merchants Acceptance Corp. served on 3/5/2021, answer due on 3/26/2021. (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Merchants Acceptance Corp.. (Hasson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey I. Hasson appearing on behalf of Merchants Acceptance Corp. Filed by on behalf of Merchants Acceptance Corp.. (Hasson, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued Electronically as to Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued Electronically as to Merchants Acceptance Corp. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/16/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 7/16/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7895932 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jeffrey Rumelhart against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Schumacher, Kyle) (Entered: 02/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant