Rumble, Inc. v. Google LLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15424117.). Filed byRumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2021) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2021) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2021) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rumble, Inc... (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/19/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for April 20, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by April 13th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-00229-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Google LLC's Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Google LLC, and Rumble, Inc.. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/26/2021) Modified on 1/27/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Application for Refund re #1 Complaint, Receipt Number 0971-15424013 by Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Payment History)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 2/24/2021) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Refund Status re #14 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 3/26/2021. Replies due by 4/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Request for Judicial Notice re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Partial Motion to Dismiss Complaint: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #17 Declaration in Support, Defendant's Request for Consideration of Documents Incorporated by Reference filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #16 , #17 ) (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: When filing a motion, the Declaration should be filed as attachment to the motion. They are not to be filed separately. [err102] Cor rected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #17 Declaration in Support, filed by Google LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Deadlines filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #19 Stipulation Regarding Case Deadlines. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021; Motions due by 5/27/2021; Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2021; and Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2021 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google LLC. Filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Deadlines filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 5/13/2021) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #22 Stipulation Regarding Case Deadlines. Motions due by 6/16/2021 and Responses due by 7/14/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ***Re-filed, See Docket No. #28 *** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021) Modified on 6/17/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsels (Philip J. Lovieno, Jack G. Stern, Nicholas A Gravante, Jr.) must file their own Pro Hac Vice Application using their own ECF Profiles to appear on the docket. [err102] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) filed by Rumble, Inc., #25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) filed by Rumble, Inc., #24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) filed by Rumble, Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033158.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jack G. Stern ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033239.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Iovieno ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16033258.) Filing fee previously paid on June 2, 2021 filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/14/2021. Replies due by 7/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/16/2021) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jack G. Stern. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Philip J. Iovieno. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas A. Gravante, Jr (Gravante, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Stern (Stern, Jack) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/17/2021) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Google LLC and Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 6/21/2021) Modified on 6/22/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Dkt. No. #39 Stipulation regarding Case Deadlines. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its partial motion to dismiss and motion to strike on or before August 13, 2021. The Court CONTINUES the case management conference from June 29, 2021 to September 9, 2021, at 2:00 p.m., to be held along with the hearing on the Dkt. No. #32 motion to dismiss. The Court further DIRECTS the parties to submit a joint case management statement by September 2, 2021. All counsel shall use the following dial-in information to access the call: Dial-In: 888-808-6929; Passcode: 6064255For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2021) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint ) filed byRumble, Inc.. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/14/2021) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE DEADLINES filed by Google LLC and Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Schmidtlein)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #42 Stipulation REGARDING CASE DEADLINES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) PLAINTIFF RUMBLE, INC.S CORRECTED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. 32) by Rumble, Inc.. Amendment to #41 Opposition/Response to Motion . (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2021) Modified on 7/21/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) REPLY (re #32 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #21 Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Certificate of Interested Entities by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 8/26/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Rumble, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/2/2021) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) * DUPLICATE - See [47-1] * Proposed Order re #47 Joint Case Management Statement /Proposed Scheduling Order by Rumble, Inc. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/2/2021) Modified on 9/3/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr: Telephonic Motion Hearing held and Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference NOT held on 9/9/2021.Total Time in Court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Jack Stern and Robert Dickerson. Defendant Attorney: John Schmidtlein. The motion to strike and motion to dismiss (docket no. #32 ) are argued and submitted by the parties and taken under submission by the Court. Written order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/9/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Rumble, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/09/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 9/10/2021) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Transcript of Proceedings held on September 9, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #49 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2021. (Related document(s) #49 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/29/2021) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Robert William Dickerson (Dickerson, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2021) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/9/2021 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Change of Address by John Edward Schmidtlein for counsel for Defendant Google LLC (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Allan William Jansen for Rumble, Inc. (Jansen, Allan) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Attorney Allan W. Jansen needs to update profile in the ECF account as the current docket shows an inactive account with the email address ajansen 4;sheppardmullin.com (Inactive). This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #56 Notice of Appearance filed by Rumble, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2022) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER DENYING #32 MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE.Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/30/2022 02:00 PM. The August 23rd proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/29/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2022) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less