This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2021 at 18:14:24 (UTC).

Ruiz v. XPO Logistics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 Ruiz filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against XPO Logistics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03339

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rachel Ruiz

Defendants

XPO Enterprise Services, LLC

XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.

XPO Logistics LTL, Inc.

XPO Logistics, Inc.

XPO Logistics Inc

XPO Logistics LTL Inc

XPO Logistics Freight Inc

XPO Enterprise Services LLC

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittney Lynne Thompson

Attorney at Bailey & Galyen

1300 Summit Avenue, Suite 650, 817-27-6000

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Jamie Jean Gilmore

Attorney at Bailey & Galyen

1300 Summit Avenue, Suite 650

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

David A Scott

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

500 N Akard Street, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

William L Davis

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

500 N. Akard, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Courtenay L Bass

Attorney at Gilbert Mediation Group

12001 N Central Expressway, Ste 650

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Scott, David) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by 1/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/14/2021) (hml) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scott, David) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc filed by Rachel Ruiz. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 5/2/2022 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Motions due by 10/29/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (axm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#9

(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (axm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit(s) Scheduling Order

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc, XPO Logistics LTL Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Scheduling Order) (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court sets this case for a scheduling hearing via teleconference on 11/30/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Lead counsel and/or local counsel for each party, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present on the call. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/9/2020) (twd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#2

(#2) Supplemental Document by XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit(s) G - Affidavit of Service - XPO Logistics Freight, Inc.

1 #7

Exhibit(s) F - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics LTL, Inc.

1 #5

Exhibit(s) D - Citation Issued to XPO Enterprise Services, LLC

1 #4

Exhibit(s) C - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics, Inc.

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Enterprise Services, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11336736) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Documents for Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Case Docket - Ruiz v. XPO Logistics, Inc. et al - No. CC-20-04441-A, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics, Inc., #5 Exhibit(s) D - Citation Issued to XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #7 Exhibit(s) F - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics LTL, Inc., #8 Exhibit(s) G - Affidavit of Service - XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #9 Exhibit(s) H - Affidavit of Service - XPO Enterprise Services, #10 Exhibit(s) I - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, #11 Cover Sheet) (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Scott, David) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint by 1/29/2021. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/14/2021) (hml) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Scott, David) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc filed by Rachel Ruiz. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gilmore, Jamie) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 5/2/2022 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2021. Motions due by 10/29/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2022 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (axm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days before trial. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (axm) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER: At the FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference, held on November 30, 2020, Plaintiff orally moved for leave to amend the Complaint. The Court granted the Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file an amended Complaint on or before December 30, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/30/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2020. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jamie Gilmore; Defense - David Scott. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :07. (TUB) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order filed by XPO Enterprise Services LLC, XPO Logistics Freight Inc, XPO Logistics Inc, XPO Logistics LTL Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Scheduling Order) (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court sets this case for a scheduling hearing via teleconference on 11/30/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Lead counsel and/or local counsel for each party, and all unrepresented parties, shall be present on the call. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 11/9/2020) (twd) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc.. (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplemental Document by XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Logistics, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by XPO Logistics, Inc., XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., XPO Enterprise Services, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11336736) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Documents for Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Case Docket - Ruiz v. XPO Logistics, Inc. et al - No. CC-20-04441-A, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics, Inc., #5 Exhibit(s) D - Citation Issued to XPO Enterprise Services, LLC, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #7 Exhibit(s) F - Citation Issued to XPO Logistics LTL, Inc., #8 Exhibit(s) G - Affidavit of Service - XPO Logistics Freight, Inc., #9 Exhibit(s) H - Affidavit of Service - XPO Enterprise Services, #10 Exhibit(s) I - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition, #11 Cover Sheet) (Davis, William) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO ENTERPRISE SERVICES INC. DBA XPO LOGISTCIS is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtenay L Bass