This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2022 at 08:11:25 (UTC).

Ruiz v. Principal Life Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Ruiz filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Principal Life Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Joseph and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01325

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Joseph

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raul Ruiz

Defendant

Principal Life Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Price McNamara

Defendant Attorneys

Allison White Smalley

Grace Robinson Murphy

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5108649) filed by Raul Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Price McNamara added to party Raul Ruiz(pty:pla))(aty,McNamara, John) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Principal Life Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Principal Life Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services Inc, Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group Inc for Principal Life Insurance Co. (aty,Smalley, Allison) Modified on 6/9/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Principal Life Insurance Co answer due 6/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/15/2022. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Principal Life Insurance Co.(aty,Smalley, Allison) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Grace Robinson Murphy for Principal Life Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/8/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#11

(#11) (VACATED) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER For ERISA Benefits Case to be Determined on Administrative Record. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/8/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified to reflect vacated per 13 Electronic Order on 7/12/2022 (Chicola, C). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#12

(#12) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#14

(#14) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/11/2022. The Court notified the parties that a Case Management Order may be issued which would vacate the proposed scheduling order. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of the recent filing by the Clerk, IT IS ORDERED that the #11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER is hereby VACATED. Counsel is to follow briefing deadlines found within #12 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/12/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/11/2022. The Court notified the parties that a Case Management Order may be issued which would vacate the proposed scheduling order. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) (VACATED) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER For ERISA Benefits Case to be Determined on Administrative Record. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/8/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified to reflect vacated per 13 Electronic Order on 7/12/2022 (Chicola, C). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Grace Robinson Murphy for Principal Life Insurance Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/8/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5167822) by Principal Life Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Affidavit of Grace Murphy, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Smalley, Allison) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Enter Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order for ERISA Benefits Case to be Determined on Administrative Record by Raul Ruiz, Principal Life Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McNamara, John) Modified on 7/8/2022 to add filer (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2022 10:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the undersigned magistrate judge will conduct a telephone conference on Monday, July 11, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. for the purpose of setting this matter for trial. In order to access the conference, the parties shall dial (877) 336-1839 and enter Access Code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/1/2022. (crt,Blanke, S) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Principal Life Insurance Co.(aty,Smalley, Allison) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Principal Life Insurance Co answer due 6/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/15/2022. (crt,Taylor, L) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Principal Life Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Principal Financial Services Inc, Corporate Parent Principal Financial Group Inc for Principal Life Insurance Co. (aty,Smalley, Allison) Modified on 6/9/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Principal Life Insurance Co. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Allison White Smalley added to party Principal Life Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Smalley, Allison) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Principal Life Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Principal Life Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5108649) filed by Raul Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Price McNamara added to party Raul Ruiz(pty:pla))(aty,McNamara, John) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less