This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2021 at 07:18:30 (UTC).

Ruiz Escobar v. AvalonBay Communities, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 Ruiz Escobar filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AvalonBay Communities, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02850

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Ruiz-Escobar

Defendants

AvalonBay Communities, Inc.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Montes, Jr

Attorney at Mass and Montes LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Mehrdad Bokhour

Attorney at Bokhour Law Group APC

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Michael S Kun

Attorney at Epstein Becker and Green PC

1925 Century Park East Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2506

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 2, 2021. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc., identifying AvalonBay Communities, Inc. and Luis Ruiz-Escobar. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc.. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/1/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants AvalonBay Communities, Inc., Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Luis Ruiz-Escobar. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/13/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc., re Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on April 2, 2021. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc., identifying AvalonBay Communities, Inc. and Luis Ruiz-Escobar. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc.. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV49873 Receipt No: ACACDC-31034827 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant AvalonBay Communities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Veronica Robertazzi, #4 Summons and Complaint, #5 Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Michael S Kun added to party AvalonBay Communities, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Kun