This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 06:06:02 (UTC).

Ruggiero v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Ruggiero filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01949

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Ruggiero

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc

Citizens Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Zemel

Attorney at Zemel Law LLC

1373 Broad Street, Suite 203-C

Clifton, NJ 07013

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Husick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5648081) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Husick, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#19

(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#17

(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/22/2020 filed by Anthony Ruggiero. (Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Husick on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Husick, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

14 #1

Affidavit of Attorney Andrew Husick

#14

(#14) MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Husick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5648081) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Andrew Husick)Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann H. Rubin on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Daniels on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/12/2019.(Pipech, L.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Citizens Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Zemel* *Zemel Law LLC* *1373 Broad Street, Suite 203-C* *Clifton, NJ 07013*. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Ruggiero, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Ruggiero, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Ruggiero, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Husick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5648081) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Husick, Andrew) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Special Defenses with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/22/2020 filed by Anthony Ruggiero. (Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Husick on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Husick, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew J. Husick. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/22/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/22/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew J. Husick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5648081) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Andrew Husick)Motions referred to William I. Garfinkel(Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Ann H. Rubin on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc (Rubin, Ann) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Daniels on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (Daniels, Eric) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for all pretrial matters excluding trial, unless the parties consent to trial before the magistrate judge. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/12/2019.(Pipech, L.) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Citizens Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel Zemel* *Zemel Law LLC* *1373 Broad Street, Suite 203-C* *Clifton, NJ 07013*. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Anthony Ruggiero, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/11/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/9/2020. Discovery due by 6/11/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12-11-19.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketJudge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to all defendants. (Zemel, Daniel) Modified on 12/11/2019 to correct parties(Walker, J.). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5586433.), filed by Anthony Ruggiero.(Zemel, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.