This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:11 (UTC).

Ruffin v. New Beacon Healthcare Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Ruffin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against New Beacon Healthcare Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00754

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimese Ruffin

Defendant

New Beacon Healthcare Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren Shine

Attorney at SHINE LAW FIRM LLC

Po Box 660011

Birmingham, AL 35226

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL This case is before the court on Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #2 ; this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/29/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against New Beacon Healthcare Group, LLC, filed by Jimese Ruffin.(JLC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jimese Ruffin (Shine, Lauren) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL This case is before the court on Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #2 ; this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/29/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jimese Ruffin (Shine, Lauren) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against New Beacon Healthcare Group, LLC, filed by Jimese Ruffin.(JLC) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.