This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2022 at 07:29:02 (UTC).

Rueda Cristancho v. GL Staffing Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Rueda Cristancho filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against GL Staffing Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20093

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho

Defendants

GL Staffing Services, Inc.

Monat Global Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Juan J. Perez

1414 Nw 107Th Ave., Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

Defendant Attorneys

Brian M. McPherson

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley & Stewart

777 S Flagler Drive, Suite 500 E

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-6194

Riley Francis Kennedy

Attorney at Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.

777 South Flagler Drive, Suite 500 East

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Jessica DeBono Anderson

Attorney at Cole, Scott, & Kissnae, P.A.

1900 Summit Tower Blvd., Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Non Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Jury Demand (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/05/2022)

#14

(#14) Defendant GL-Staffing Services, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

13 #2

Exhibit B - Jury Waiver Clause

13 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

13 #13

Main Document

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Monat Global Corp.. Attorney Jessica DeBono Anderson added to party Monat Global Corp.(pty:dft). (Anderson, Jessica) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. McPherson on behalf of GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Attorney Brian M. McPherson added to party GL Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (McPherson, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho. Monat Global Corp. served on 1/14/2022, response/answer due 2/4/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho. GL Staffing Services, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Monat Global Corp.. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Non Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Jury Demand (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant GL-Staffing Services, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. (Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, Jury Demand by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Responses due by 3/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Jury Waiver Clause)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant GL Staffing's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. GL Staffing Services, Inc. shall have until and including February 18, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/14/2022. (gie) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Monat Global Corp.. Attorney Jessica DeBono Anderson added to party Monat Global Corp.(pty:dft). (Anderson, Jessica) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M. McPherson on behalf of GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Attorney Brian M. McPherson added to party GL Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (McPherson, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendant GL Staffing's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. GL Staffing shall have until and including February 14, 2022 to respond to the Complaint. This entry constitutes the PAPERLESS ORDER in its entirety. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 2/2/2022. (gie) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by GL Staffing Services, Inc.. Attorney Riley Francis Kennedy added to party GL Staffing Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Riley) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho. Monat Global Corp. served on 1/14/2022, response/answer due 2/4/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho. GL Staffing Services, Inc. served on 1/12/2022, response/answer due 2/2/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Monat Global Corp.. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to GL Staffing Services, Inc.. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GL Staffing Services, Inc., Monat Global Corp.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15300526, filed by Leidi Caterine Rueda Cristancho. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GL STAFFING SERV INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Monat Global Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian M. McPherson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Riley Francis Kennedy