This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2022 at 07:35:59 (UTC).

Rudy v. VT Hackney Kidron

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 Rudy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against VT Hackney Kidron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02058

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Rudy

Defendant

VT Hackney Kidron d/b/a VT Hackney Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Elizabeth LeMieux-Fillery

Attorney at The Law Offices of Eric A. Shore

1500 Jfk Blvdsuite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

Philip K. Kontul

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

One Ppg Placesuite 1900

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Word Count by VT Hackney Kidron re #5 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VT Hackney Kidron.(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

6 #4

Proposed Order

6 #3

Certificate of Service

6 #2

Exhibit(s)

6 #1

Memo Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition

#6

(#6) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christina Rudy. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

5 #1

Unpublished Opinion(s)

#5

(#5) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VT Hackney Kidron. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Exhibit(s) A-B

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by VT Hackney Kidron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/14/2021. (jr) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VT Hackney Kidron. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Word Count by VT Hackney Kidron re #5 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VT Hackney Kidron.(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christina Rudy. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(LeMieux-Fillery, Mary) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by VT Hackney Kidron. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by VT Hackney Kidron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/14/2021. (jr) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Attachment #2 of main document (Exhibit B) replaced as the filing did not upload correctly. Docket entry #3 was made to replace court error however #3 was deleted as correction was made to main document. (nr) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by VT Hackney Kidron. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VT Hackney Kidron from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21-1159. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5780282), filed by VT Hackney Kidron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal from State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/8/2021) (nr). (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip K. Kontul