This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2022 at 19:07:30 (UTC).

Rudi Vanegas v. DHL Express (USA), Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Rudi Vanegas filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DHL Express USA , Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Percy Anderson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01538

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rudi Vanegas

Defendants

Does 1 to 20, inclusive

DHL Express (USA), Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashkan Y Shakouri

Attorney at Shakouri Law Firm

11601 Wilshire Boulevard 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Chantelle C Egan

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Parnian Vafaeenia

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Richard Burk Lapp

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Elizabeth J MacGregor

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #11 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court. For the reasons stated above, Defendant has failed to satisfy its burden of showing, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy exceeds $5,000,000 as required for federal jurisdiction under CAFA. The Court therefore grants Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. This action is hereby remanded to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV16014, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (See document for details). MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY SUPPORTING NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Plaintiff Rudi Vanegas. (Shakouri, Ashkan) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #11 filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Rudi Vanegas. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Shakouri, Ashkan) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,, #9 (Response to Order to Show Cause re Remand) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Barcon, #2 Declaration of Elizabeth MacGregor)(MacGregor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. In the Notice of Removal, Defendant alleges that the amount in controversy exceeds $5,000,000. (Removal at 10.) Defendant argues Plaintiffs allege Defendant had a "policy and/or practice of not authorizing and/or permitting their non-exempt employees, including Plaintiffs, to take lawful meal or rest breaks." (Id.) Defendants further allege plaintiff Vargas claims he was not provided with legally compliant meal and rest breaks for the "overwhelming majority of his shifts." (Id.) Defendant argues the amount in controversy is exceeded just by looking at Plaintiffs' meal and rest break claims, and does not address whether any of Plaintiffs' other claims for relief would satisfy the amount in controversy. For this reason, the Court hereby orders Defendant to show cause in writing why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction because Defendant has failed to show, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy requirement for CAFA jurisdiction has been met. Defendant's response to this Order to Show Cause shall be filed no later than March 5, 2021. (See document for full details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. (filed in state court 10/9/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 156)(esa) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Rudi Vanegas, upon Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. served on 5/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 6/5/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 93) (esa) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to First Amended Complaint filed by defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. (filed in state court 10/16/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 62)(esa) Modified on 2/19/2021 (esa). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants DHL Express (USA), Inc., Does, filed by plaintiff Rudi Vanegas. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2)(esa) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants DHL Express (USA), Inc., Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Rudi Vanegas. (filed in state court 4/24/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 25) (esa) Modified on 2/19/2021 (esa). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc. identifying DHL as Corporate Parent. (Egan, Chantelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Egan, Chantelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc., (Egan, Chantelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV16014 Receipt No: ACACDC-30614064 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant DHL Express (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - V, #2 Declaration of Joshua Barcon, #3 Declaration of Parnian Vafaeenia) (Attorney Chantelle C Egan added to party DHL Express (USA), Inc.(pty:dft))(Egan, Chantelle) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DHL EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth J MacGregor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Burk Lapp(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chantelle Cappa Egan