Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/27/2020 at 11:14:08 (UTC).

Rucker v. Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Rucker filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00454

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lamont Rucker

Defendant

Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Constance A. Mann

Attorney at The Law Offices of Constance Mann

1107 Battlewood Street

Franklin, TN 37069

Defendant Attorneys

Adam S. Buddenbohn

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP (Chattanooga)

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Hillary L. Klein

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP (Chattanooga)

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Unopposed) (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. re #6 Answer to Amended Complaint (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/16/2020. (dt) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Unopposed) by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc..(Buddenbohn, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., filed by Lamont Rucker.(Mann, Constance) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 1:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

1 #4

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2- TN Secretary of State

1 #1

Exhibit 1- State Court Case Files

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-C-855. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3148917) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Case Files, #2 Exhibit 2- TN Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Unopposed) (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. re #6 Answer to Amended Complaint (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#7 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/16/2020. (dt) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#6 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include all Counsel on the certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (dt) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference (Unopposed) by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc.. (Klein, Hillary) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc..(Buddenbohn, Adam) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc., filed by Lamont Rucker.(Mann, Constance) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 1:15 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Hillary L. Klein, Adam S. Buddenbohn and Constance A. Mann. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. (dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Associated Wholesale Grocers, Inc. from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20-C-855. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3148917) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court Case Files, #2 Exhibit 2- TN Secretary of State, #3 Exhibit 3- Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam S Buddenbohn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hillary L Klein