This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:48:19 (UTC).

Ruchman and Associates, Inc v. Sev1Tech, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Ruchman and Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sev1Tech, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Claude M. Hilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00011

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruchman and Associates, Inc

Defendant

SEV1TECH, LLC

12700 Blackforest Lane, No. 306

Woodbridge, VA 22192

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd A. Pilot

Attorney at The Trademark Institute

Po Box 320578

Alexandria, VA 22320

Defendant Attorneys

William Clarke Miller

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP (DC)

1200 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Matthew Jeffrey Maclean

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP (DC)

1200 17Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jeffrey Maclean on behalf of Sev1Tech, LLC (Maclean, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#15

(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Eden Brown Gaines. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 2/24/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/20/2020. (rban, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Supplement Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#10

(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eden Brown Gaines and Certification of Local Counsel Todd A Pilot Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7082024. by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Hearing Date set for March 13, 2020 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

6 #3

Proposed Order

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Affidavit of Leslie Collins

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Jeffrey Maclean on behalf of Sev1Tech, LLC (Maclean, Matthew) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Eden Brown Gaines. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 2/24/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Responses due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/20/2020. (rban, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eden Brown Gaines and Certification of Local Counsel Todd A Pilot Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7082024. by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to refile the document. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Hearing Date set for March 13, 2020 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leslie Collins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sev1Tech, LLC. (Miller, William) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Sev1Tech, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Pilot, Todd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/7/2020) (dvanm, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 1/7/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Ruchman and Associates, Inc. (Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7010529.), filed by Ruchman and Associates, Inc.(Pilot, Todd) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less