This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:39:56 (UTC).

Rubio v. Harbor Freight Tools et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Rubio filed an Other lawsuit against Harbor Freight Tools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peter Bray and Lynn N Hughes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04713

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peter Bray

Presiding Judge

Lynn N Hughes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roberto Berdeja Rubio

Channel View, TX 77530

Defendants

Talking House

Harbor Freight Tools

Texas Department Of Criminal Justice

Emila Salinas/Talking House

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Return of Service Unexecuted as to Emila Salinas/Talking House re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Harbor Freight Tools served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(agould, 3) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

7 #1

attachment

#7

(#7) Return of Service Unexecuted as to Texas Department Of Criminal Justice re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Appointment of attorney by Roberto Berdeja Rubio, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roberto Berdeja Rubio. (Application to Proceed IFP Conditionally Granted on 12/4/2019 by The Honorable Andrew S. Hanen). (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Unexecuted as to Emila Salinas/Talking House re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Harbor Freight Tools served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(agould, 3) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Unexecuted as to Texas Department Of Criminal Justice re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(sguevara, 4) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Emila Salinas/Talking House, Harbor Freight Tools, Texas Department Of Criminal Justice, USM 285, copy of complaint and IFP order forwarded to USM for service., filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Appointment of attorney by Roberto Berdeja Rubio, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Roberto Berdeja Rubio. (Application to Proceed IFP Conditionally Granted on 12/4/2019 by The Honorable Andrew S. Hanen). (jdav, 4) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.