This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 10:59:43 (UTC).

Rubenzer et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Rubenzer filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patricia Rubenzer

Trevor Rubenzer

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D Alan Lazenby

Attorney at Lazenby Law Firm

Po Box 6099

Spartanburg, SC 29304

Defendant Attorney

Alfred Johnston Cox

Attorney at Gallivan White and Boyd

Po Box 7368, 1201 Main Street, Suite 1200

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/25/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2021, Discovery due by 11/8/2021, Motion in Limine due by 1/10/2022, Motions due by 11/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/17/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 2/7/2022, Mediation Due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/30/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#15

(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Rubenzer, Trevor Rubenzer.(Lazenby, D) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#14

(#14) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Wednesday, 4/14/21 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21 Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#10

(#10) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/31/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/25/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2021, Discovery due by 9/7/2021, Motion in Limine due by 11/8/2021, Motions due by 9/21/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/15/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 12/6/2021, Mediation Due by 10/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Rubenzer, Trevor Rubenzer.(Lazenby, D) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, (alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-42-00419. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9697792), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/25/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/20/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2021, Discovery due by 11/8/2021, Motion in Limine due by 1/10/2022, Motions due by 11/22/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/17/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 2/7/2022, Mediation Due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 4/30/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Rubenzer, Trevor Rubenzer.(Lazenby, D) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(Cox, Alfred) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) Minute Entry: phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Civil Rule (D.S.C.) 26.03(1-4) interrogatories within 14 days. In the event the parties determine it is necessary at this stage, they are further directed to submit a joint proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days. (alew, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Wednesday, 4/14/21 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21 Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/31/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/25/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/21/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/9/2021, Discovery due by 9/7/2021, Motion in Limine due by 11/8/2021, Motions due by 9/21/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/15/2021, Bench Trial Deadline 12/6/2021, Mediation Due by 10/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 3/11/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Rubenzer, Trevor Rubenzer.(Lazenby, D) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule Answers to 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (3/23/21). (alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #4 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #5 Answer to Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, (alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-42-00419. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9697792), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Johnston Cox