This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 10:27:33 (UTC).

Ruben Edward Mora v. Lt. Williams et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Ruben Edward Mora filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lt Williams. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02708

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruben Edward Mora

Delano, CA 93216

Defendants

Warden Johnson

Salas

Lt. Williams

M. Smith

Ms. Davis

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER #7 by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Because Plaintiff has failed to file the requisite documents to obtain either a preliminary injunction or a TRO in violation of Local Rule 65-1 and, critically, because Plaintiff has failed to actually request anything or put forth any argument such that the Court has no basis to judge the proposed order, the Court neither grants nor denies Plaintiff's PI OSC. However, to the extent Plaintiff seeks some form of relief from the Court, the Court directs Plaintiff to the Local Rules for filing requirements and, in particular, Local Rule 65-1 if Plaintiff seeks a TRO or a preliminary injunction. (see document for further details) (hr) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Ruben E. Mora filed by Plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (hr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST filed by Plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (hr) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (et) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Ruben E. Mora filed by Plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (hr) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for pretrial proceedings. (see document for details) (et) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis re APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . (dts) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (esa) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (esa) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Davis(Peace Officer, in individual capacity), Davis(Peace Officer, in official capacity), Johnson(California State Prison Los Angeles, in official capacity), Johnson(California State Prison Los Angeles, in individual capacity), Salas(Peace Officer, in official capacity), Salas(Peace Officer, in individual capacity), M. Smith(Peace Officer, in individual capacity), M. Smith(Peace Officer, in official capacity), Williams(Peace Officer, in official capacity), Williams(Peace Officer, in individual capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, filed by plaintiff Ruben Edward Mora. (esa) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms Davis is a litigant

Latest cases where SALAS is a litigant