This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 10:16:43 (UTC).

RSCC Wire & Cable LLC v. Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 RSCC Wire Cable LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12219

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RSCC Wire & Cable LLC

Defendant

Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John E. Nilsson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Jacob M. Bass

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20001-3743

Christopher J. Renk

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kay Scholer LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60602

Michael J. Harris

Attorney at Arnold & Porter

70 West Madison Street, Suite 4200

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Tia D. Fenton

Attorney at Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP

1940 Duke Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Alec M. Royka

Attorney at Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP

1940 Duke Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Jeffrey B. McIntyre

Attorney at Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP

1940 Duke Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

Justin P. O'Brien

Attorney at Lovett O'Brien LLP

One Beacon Street, #1320

Boston, MA 02108

Christopher Ricciuti

Attorney at Oblon, McClelland, Maier & Neustadt, LLP

1940 Duke Street

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

12 #4

Exhibit D - Royka Declaration

12 #3

Exhibit C - Riccitui Declaration

12 #2

Exhibit B - McIntyre Declaration

12 #1

Exhibit A - Fenton Declaration

#12

#10

#8

5 #3

Ex. C - Declaration of Jacob Michael Bass

5 #2

Ex. B - Declaration of Michael J. Harris

5 #1

Ex. A - Declaration of Christopher J. Renk

#5

1 #6

Category Form

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Tia D. Fenton, Jeffrey B. McIntyre, Christopher Ricciuti, and Alec M. Royka. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tia D. Fenton, Jeffrey B. McIntyre, Christopher Ricciuti, Alec M. Royka Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8601371 by Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fenton Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - McIntyre Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Riccitui Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Royka Declaration)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to March 8, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC answer due 3/8/2021. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to March 8, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC.(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Christopher J. Renk, Michael J. Harris, and Jacob Michael Bass. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. Acknowledgement filed by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. (Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Christopher J. Renk, Michael J. Harris and Jacob Michael Bass Filing fee: $ 300, receipt number 0101-8552974 by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Declaration of Christopher J. Renk, #2 Ex. B - Declaration of Michael J. Harris, #3 Ex. C - Declaration of Jacob Michael Bass)(Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Nilsson on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable LLC (Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC identifying Corporate Parent Marmon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Marmon Wire & Cable, Inc., Corporate Parent Marmon Energy Services Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for RSCC Wire & Cable LLC.. (Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Prysmian Cable and Systems USA, LLC Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8552936 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RSCC Wire & Cable LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Category Form)(Nilsson, John) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RSCC Wire & Cable LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tia D Fenton(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Ricciuti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin P. O'Brien