This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2019 at 07:08:57 (UTC).

RSA Protective Technologies, LLC v. Delta Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 RSA Protective Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Delta Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06024

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RSA Protective Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Delta Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sasha G Rao

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale LLP

600 Montgomery Street Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Duane Kumagai

Attorney at Maynard Cooper and Gale LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joseph V Saphia

Attorney at Haug Partners LLP

745 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10151

Jessica H Zafonte

Attorney at Haug Partners LLP

745 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10151

 

Court Documents

#24

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

22 #1

Exhibit A - Proof of Service

#22

#21

#20

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER Re Stipulation and Request to Extend Defendant's Time to respond to initial Complaint By (More than 30 days) #23 by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Court finds good cause to APPROVE the Stipulation. The time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended by forty-five (45) days, up to and including 10/24/2019. (jp) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 24, 2019 / re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #21 - date of service August 19, 2019. Response to Complaint due September 9, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Delta Scientific Corporation served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Candice Classic, Receptionist, individual authorized to accept service. in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph V Saphia APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC, designating Duane Kumagai as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Jessica H Zafonte APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC, designating Duane Kumagai as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jessica L. Sblendorio on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney John R. Balaes on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph V. Saphia to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24120470) filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kumagai, Duane) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jessica H. Zafonte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24120393) filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kumagai, Duane) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica H Zafonte. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph V Saphia. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC, identifying none. (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24078216 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff RSA Protective Technologies, LLC. (Attorney Sasha G Rao added to party RSA Protective Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Rao, Sasha) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RSA Protective Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DELTA SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duane Kumagai