This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 10:24:44 (UTC).

RS Old Mills, LLC v. Suffern Partners LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 RS Old Mills, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Suffern Partners LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Seibel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-04403

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Seibel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RS Old Mill, LLC

RS Old Mills RD, LLC

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Suffern Partners LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

Avrohom Kaufman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

James B. Glucksman

Attorney at Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP

605 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10158

Robert L. Rattet

Attorney at Davidoff Hutcher & Citron LLP

605 Third Avenue34Th Floor

New York, NY 10158

Gilbert Backenroth

Attorney at Hahn & Hessen LLP

488 Madison Avenueste 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Stephen J Grable

Attorney at Hahn & Hessen LLP

488 Madison Avenuesuite/Floor 15

New York, NY 10022

Steven Roderick Aquino

Attorney at Hahn & Hessen LLP

488 Madison Avenuesuite/Floor 15

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketUSBC Case number - 21-07027 (shl). (gp) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York..(gp) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DUPLICATE ORIGINAL AMENDED STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Bankruptcy Court as related to Bankruptcy Court Case No. 21-22280. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 157(a) any or all cases under title 11 and any or all proceedings arising under title 11 or arising in or related to a case under title 11 are referred to the bankruptcy judges for this district. (See 1:12-mc-00032 (M-10-468) Order Filed February 1, 2012) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/2012) (gp) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-8905 addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Stephen J. Grable dated May 21, 2021. Document filed by Suffern Partners LLC..(Grable, Stephen) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen J Grable on behalf of Suffern Partners LLC..(Grable, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gilbert Backenroth on behalf of Suffern Partners LLC..(Backenroth, Gilbert) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Roderick Aquino on behalf of Suffern Partners LLC..(Aquino, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cv-08905-CS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney James B. Glucksman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Notice (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the related case statement. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (vf) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert L. Rattet. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Blank; Nature of Suit code 150 (Contract: Recovery/Enforcement); Dollar Demand 30,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1452; the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 290 (Real Property: Other); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 9,999,999. (vf) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Robert L. Rattet. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: RS Old Mill Rd, LLC. The party was added to the case in error. (vf) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James B. Glucksman on behalf of Suffern Partners LLC..(Glucksman, James) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Related Case Statement re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal,,. Document filed by Suffern Partners LLC..(Glucksman, James) Modified on 5/18/2021 (vf). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Suffern Partners LLC..(Glucksman, James) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Glucksman, James) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners Suffern Partners LLC added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by Suffern Partners LLC. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,,..(Rattet, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Rockland. Case Number: 031809/2020. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24546302).Document filed by Suffern Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Answer Counterclaims and Third Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Answer to Counterclaims, #4 Exhibit 4 - Answer to Third Party Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Decision on Motion to Strike Notice of Pendency August 20, 2020, #6 Exhibit 6- Decision on Motion to Fix Undertaking).(Rattet, Robert) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Suffern Partners LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Joseph Grable

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B. Glucksman Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gilbert Backenroth