This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:25:24 (UTC).

RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC v. CUCCINELLI et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against CUCCINELLI. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Trevor N. McFadden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03647

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Trevor N. McFadden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

GREGORY A. RICHARDSON

KEVIN K. MCALEENAN

KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. David Folds

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ, PC

901 K Street, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREGORY A. RICHARDSON served on 12/16/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#12

(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2020. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2019. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2020. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2019. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC (Folds, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #5

Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security

1 #3

Summons to Kevin K. McAleenan

1 #2

Summons to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626638) filed by RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #3 Summons to Kevin K. McAleenan, #4 Summons to Gregory A. Richardson, #5 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #6 Summons to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8)(Folds, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GREGORY A. RICHARDSON served on 12/16/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN K. MCALEENAN served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2020. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2019. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2020. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/12/2019. (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/13/2019 (Folds, J.) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2019. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC (Folds, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6626638) filed by RR STONE PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, #3 Summons to Kevin K. McAleenan, #4 Summons to Gregory A. Richardson, #5 Summons to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, #6 Summons to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8)(Folds, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less