Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 08:59:17 (UTC).

Rozich et al v. Citibank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Rozich filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Citibank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is Geoffrey W. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Geoffrey W. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ryan Molitor

Michelle Rozich

Defendant

Citibank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew B. Byrne, Esq.

Attorney at Gravel & Shea PC

76 St. Paul Street, 7Th Floor, P.O. Box 369

Burlington, VT 05402-0369

Defendant Attorney

Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq.

Attorney at Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer P.C.

30 Main Street, Suite 500, P.O. Box 1489

Burlington, VT 05402-1489

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 2:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

16 #1

Certificate of Service

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

15 #1

Certificate of Service

#15

(#15) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Edelman, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

14 #1

Certificate of Service

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

(#13) MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

10 #2

Document has been removed

10 #1

Exhibit A

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citibank, N.A. from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 810-9-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 2:30 PM in Burlington Courtroom 110 before Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. (pjl) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference; and granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be set for January 3, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 12/19/2019. (This is a text-only Order.) (jal) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) REPLY to Response to #13 MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE to #13 MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Edelman, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Early Rule 16 Conference filed by Ryan Molitor, Michelle Rozich. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Byrne, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY REMOVAL. Exhibit - Exhibit A attached to #10 Notice to All Adverse Parties re: #1 Notice of Removal has been removed as attached in error. (jlh) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Citibank, N.A. The original Affidavit of Joan Haslam having been received, is now attached to #3 and this entry. (law) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE to All Adverse Parties re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Citibank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A(originally filed 10/23/2019 in state court) (esb) (Attachment 2 removed on 10/31/2019) (jlh). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED Executed. Citibank, N.A. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (originally filed 9/26/2019 in state court) (esb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Assigned Docket Number. (originally filed 9/12/2019 in state court)(esb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT against Citibank, N.A. filed by Michelle Rozich, Ryan Molitor.(originally filed 9/11/2019 in state court) (esb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RECEIVED FILE and certified copy of docket sheet from State Court. (esb) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER to Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by Citibank, N.A. (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Citibank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citibank, N.A. from Vermont Superior Court, Chittenden Unit, Civil Division, case number 810-9-19 Cncv. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (esb) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra E. Edelman, Esq.