This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2020 at 08:20:36 (UTC).

Royal v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Royal filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert H. Walker and David C. Bramlette, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

Presiding Judge

David C. Bramlette, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen Royal

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Interested Party

SSA General Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ashley Brooke Thomas

Attorney at GARDBERG, CLAUSEN & KEMMERLY, PC

1015 Montlimar Drive, Suite B-4

Mobile, AL 36609

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Recommending the denial of plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 18, 2019 (King, Steve) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kathleen Royal (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Kathleen Royal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.