This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:26:33 (UTC).

Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD v. Catch All Investments LLC

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Catch All Investments LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-61708

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD

Defendant

Catch All Investments LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernesto Miguel Rubi

Attorney at Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.

1050 Caribbean Way, Suite 577

Miami, FL 33232

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Catch All Investments LLC. (vmz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Defendant Catch All Investments, LLC by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD re #1 Complaint, filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. Catch All Investments LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (vmz) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Catch All Investments LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11803242, filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. Catch All Investments LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Catch All Investments LLC. (vmz) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Defendant Catch All Investments, LLC by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD re #1 Complaint, filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD (Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (vmz) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (vmz) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Catch All Investments LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11803242, filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubi, Ernesto) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.