This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 07:17:07 (UTC).

Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC v. Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dean D. Pregerson, Karen L. Stevenson and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00248

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judges

Dean D. Pregerson

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Maersk Line AS

Kuehne and Nagel, Inc.

Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua A Southwick

Attorney at Gibson Robb and Lindh LLP

201 Mission Street Suite 2700

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

B Alexander Moghaddam

Attorney at Moghaddam and Jorgensen LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew D Kehagiaras

Attorney at Roberts and Kehagiaras LLP

One World Trade Center Suite 2350

Long Beach, CA 90831

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 3/6/20. CROSSCLAIM against cross-defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S, #2 Exhibit B to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S)(Moghaddam, B) Modified on 3/6/2020 (bm). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., Maersk Line AS. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#1

(#15) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maersk Line AS answer now due 3/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit A to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S

#21

(#21) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS, identifying Maersk Line A/S; KUEHNE & NAGEL, INC.; KUEHNE + NAGEL (IRELAND) LTD.; ROYAL AND SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC a/s/o ALLERGAN. (Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Crossclaim, #20 , for the following reasons: Other: Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both crossclaimant and crossdefendant Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. (bm) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

20 #2

Exhibit B to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., identifying Kuehne + Nagel International AG; AXA Insurance Company. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#22

(#22) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Crossclaim, #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both cross-claimant and cross-defendant. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Crossclaim, #20 , for the following reasons: Other: Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both crossclaimant and crossdefendant Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. (bm) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (wm) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Crossclaim, #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. Other error(s) with document(s): Crossclaim caption lists party Maersk Line A/S as both cross-claimant and cross-defendant. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS, identifying Maersk Line A/S; KUEHNE & NAGEL, INC.; KUEHNE + NAGEL (IRELAND) LTD.; ROYAL AND SUN ALLIANCE INSURANCE PLC a/s/o ALLERGAN. (Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) DOCUMENT STRICKEN ON 3/6/20. CROSSCLAIM against cross-defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S, #2 Exhibit B to Cross-Claim of Maersk Line A/S)(Moghaddam, B) Modified on 3/6/2020 (bm). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant and cross-claimant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., identifying Kuehne + Nagel International AG; AXA Insurance Company. (Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , CROSSCLAIM against Maersk Line AS filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc..(Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kuehne and Nagel, Inc. answer now due 3/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Kuehne and Nagel, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Maersk Line AS answer now due 3/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Maersk Line AS.(Moghaddam, B) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Kuehne and Nagel, Inc. served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, upon Defendant Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd served on 1/21/2020, answer due 2/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Process Specialist CT Corporation System - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Kuehne Nagel Ireland Ltd, Kuehne and Nagel, Inc., Maersk Line AS. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC, (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25091279 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC. (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Royal and Sun Alliance Insurance PLC(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less