This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 09:37:45 (UTC).

Roy Davis Gash v. Cadigan Santa Clara, LP, et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Roy Davis Gash filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01527

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roy Davis Gash

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Wakefield

Attorney at Lightning Law APC

10620 Treena Street Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorney

Craig D McMahon

Attorney at Kimball Tirey and St John

7676 Hazard Center Drive Suite 900B

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINALSETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROMACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OFDISMISSAL #11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than November 15, 2020. If no dismissal is filed, the Court deems the matter dismissed at that time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement OF THE CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than October 20, 2020, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). See minute order for further details. (lom) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

9 #1

Proof of Service

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File 10/14/2020 filed by Defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Cadigan Santa Clara, LP(pty:dft))(McMahon, Craig) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash, identifying CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A to Civil Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27680064 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Roy Davis Gash(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINALSETTLEMENT, REMOVING CASE FROMACTIVE CASELOAD, AND FILING OFDISMISSAL #11 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than November 15, 2020. If no dismissal is filed, the Court deems the matter dismissed at that time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement OF THE CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than October 20, 2020, why th is action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). See minute order for further details. (lom) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File 10/14/2020 filed by Defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Craig D McMahon added to party Cadigan Santa Clara, LP(pty:dft))(McMahon, Craig) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Cadigan Santa Clara, LP. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash, identifying CADIGAN SANTA CLARA, LP. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27680064 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Roy Davis Gash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Civil Complaint) (Attorney David C Wakefield added to party Roy Davis Gash(pty:pla))(Wakefield, David) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less