This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/24/2023 at 06:11:45 (UTC).

Roxanne Osuna v. Ford Motor Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Roxanne Osuna filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roxanne Osuna

Defendants

Ford Motor Company

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Aaron Cohen

Attorney at Quill and Arrow LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Won

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith

45 Fremont Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

Brian C Vanderhoof

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard and Smith LLP

45 Fremont Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22GDCV01036 Receipt No: ACACDC-34617407 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Jonathan Won added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Won, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Declaration

1 #3

Declaration

1 #4

Certificate of Interested Entities

1 #5

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Declaration, 3 Declaration, 4 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Certificate of Service are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#6

(#6) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/6/2023 AT 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#9

(#9) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - A Jury Trial is set for 7/18/2023 at 9:00 AM, with a Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2023 at 3:00 PM. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - A Jury Trial is set for 7/18/2023 at 9:00 AM, with a Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2023 at 3:00 PM. (pc) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The initial status conference scheduled for 03/06/2023 at 3:00 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. Order to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/6/2023 AT 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 Declaration, 3 Declaration, 4 Certificate of Interested Entities, 5 Certificate of Service are attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN WON IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL EXHIBIT A))(ghap) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Roxanne Osuna. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/15/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN WON IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL EXHIBIT A) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22GDCV01036 Receipt No: ACACDC-34617407 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #5 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Jonathan Won added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Won, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less