This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:39:13 (UTC).

Rowland v. Lopinto et al

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Rowland filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Lopinto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01003

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serella Rowland

Defendants

Unidentified Parties

Joseph P. Lopinto, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Murell

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Dedrick Arvell Moore

Attorney at Law Office of Dedrick A.. Moore

4962 Florida Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Lance Covington Unglesby

Attorney at Jason Rogers Williams & Associates

607 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lewis Unglesby, Sr

Attorney at Jason Rogers Williams & Associates

607 St. Charles Ave.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ronald Sidney Haley, Jr.

Attorney at Haley & Associates Attorneys At Law, LLC

8211 Goodwood Blvd., Suite E

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Rault Martiny

Attorney at Martiny & Associates

131 Airline Hwy., Suite 201

Metairie, LA 70001

Jeffrey David Martiny

Attorney at Martiny & Associates

131 Airline Hwy., Suite 201

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

6 #2

Standing Order

6 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling Conference held on 7/27/2021. Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 3:00 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2022 3:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 6/13/2022 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order) (jrc) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference is set in this matter for 7/27/2021 at 3PM in the chambers of Chief Judge Brown. Only counsel of record will be permitted to appear. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/15/2021.(pp) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Joseph P. Lopinto, III.Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Joseph P. Lopinto, III(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Unidentified Parties (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8872952) filed by Serella Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Serella Rowland(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/25/2021) (lt). Modified text on 5/25/2021 (lt). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER Scheduling Conference held on 7/27/2021. Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 3:00 PM, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/19/2022 3:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 6/13/2022 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order) (jrc) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference is set in this matter for 7/27/2021 at 3PM in the chambers of Chief Judge Brown. Only counsel of record will be permitted to appear. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/15/2021.(pp) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Joseph P. Lopinto, III.Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Joseph P. Lopinto, III(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should have been flattened. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click PRINT to adobe pdf to flatten the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Unidentified Parties (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8872952) filed by Serella Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher James Murell added to party Serella Rowland(pty:pla).(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/25/2021) (lt). Modified text on 5/25/2021 (lt). (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey David Martiny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Rault Martiny