This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 07:43:10 (UTC).

Rowaihy v. McKesson Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 Rowaihy filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against McKesson Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45129

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marsha Marie Rowaihy

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Cardinal Health, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

Anda Inc.

Henry Schein, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.

Noramco Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.)

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nka Actavis, Inc.)

Actavis, LLC

Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.)

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Onder

James G. Onder

Attorney at Onder Shelton O'Leary & Peterson

Second Floor, 110 East Lockwood

St. Louis, MO 63119

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#3

(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Actavis, LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Noramco Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Henry Schein, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#11

(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#12

(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#13

(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#14

(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Henry Schein, Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Noramco Inc. waiver sent on 1/11/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.) waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Actavis, LLC waiver sent on 1/10/2022, answer due 3/11/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marsha Rowaihy. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022 filed on behalf of Marsha Rowaihy (Onder, James) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC (fka Actavis, Inc. fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Allergan PLC (fka Actavis PLC), Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Anda Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (fka Depomed, Inc.), CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Doe 1-100, being those persons, firms, corporations, agents, servants and/or employees who authorized, ordered and/or committed the acts described in this Complaint and whose names when ascertained wi, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Indivior Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. fka Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Limited Partnership II, McKesson Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceutical, Inc., Noramco Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. (fka Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.), Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (dba Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.), Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Inc. (fka Walmart Stores, Inc.), Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Eastern Co., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nka Actavis, Inc.). Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11185403. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804-dap. Filed by Marsha Rowaihy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Onder, James) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (fka Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.) is a litigant

Latest cases where Noramco Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Mylan Pharmaceuticals Incorporated is a litigant