This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:33:01 (UTC).

Rover Pipeline LLC v. Rover Tract No(s). WV-TY-SHC-015.000 et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2019 Rover Pipeline LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Rover Tract No s WV-TY-SHC-015 000. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick P. Stamp, Jr and John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00110

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rover Pipeline LLC

Defendants

Any Unknown Owners

Rover Tract No(s). WV-TY-SHC-015.000

Harold W. Hair

Mrs. Marcella A. Hair

Jean M. Snyder

Edward L. Snyder

ROVER TRACT NO(S). WV-TY-SHC-015.000, WV-TY-SHC-017.970-TAR-17 and WV-TY-SHC-016.970-TAR-16A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren A. Williams

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Lori A. Dawkins

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

William D. Wilmoth

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, PLLC - Wheeling

1233 Main Street, Ste. 3000, P.O. Box 751

Wheeling, WV 26003-0751

 

Court Documents

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IMMEDIATE ACCESS AND POSSESSION OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT(S) TO BE CONDEMNED: Granting #5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/5/19. (soa) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#13

(#13) Other Document Proof of Service for Edward Snyder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#12

(#12) Other Document Proof of Service for Harold Hair filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#11

(#11) Other Document Proof of Service for Jean Snyder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#10

(#10) Other Document Proof of Service for Marcella Hair filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#8

(#8) Other Document re #3 Amended Complaint Verification filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S #6 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/19. (lmm) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

5 #1

Memorandum of Law

#5

(#5) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Condemnation (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Registry Funds Per Order Entered 4/5/19: $ 7,862.00, receipt number WVNE013865 (lmm) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IMMEDIATE ACCESS AND POSSESSION OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT(S) TO BE CONDEMNED: Granting #5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/5/19. (soa) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Status Conference held on 4/4/2019. (Court Reporter C. Knecht.) (cmd) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Other Document Proof of Service for Edward Snyder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Other Document Proof of Service for Harold Hair filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Other Document Proof of Service for Jean Snyder filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Other Document Proof of Service for Marcella Hair filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT re #5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Other Document re #3 Amended Complaint Verification filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S #6 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/19. (lmm) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Condemnation (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. For reasons appearing to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the civil matters listed on the attached schedule be TRANSFERRED to and placed on the active docket of the Honorable John Preston Bailey. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 3/19/2019. (kac) (Copy to counsel) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR CONDEMNATION OF TEMPORARY EASEMENT(S) against All Defendants, filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2778036. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Diagram of Easement, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.