This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:33:15 (UTC).

Rover Pipeline LLC v. ROVER TRACT NO(S). WV-MA-ML-036.000 et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2019 Rover Pipeline LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ROVER TRACT NO S WV-MA-ML-036 000. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick P. Stamp, Jr and John Preston Bailey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Frederick P. Stamp, Jr

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rover Pipeline LLC

Defendants

Michael C. Thompson

Any Unknown Owners

ROVER TRACT NO(S). WV-MA-ML-036.000

Crystal M. Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lauren A. Williams

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

Lori A. Dawkins

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC - Bridgeport

400 White Oaks Blvd

Bridgeport, WV 26330

William D. Wilmoth

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, PLLC - Wheeling

1233 Main Street, Ste. 3000, P.O. Box 751

Wheeling, WV 26003-0751

Defendant Attorneys

Christian E. Turak

Attorney at Gold, Khourey & Turak, LC

510 Tomlinson Ave.

Moundsville, WV 26041

Daniel J. Guida

3374 Main St

Weirton, WV 26062

S David Wilharm

Attorney at Rokisky & Assoicates

3200 Main Street

Weirton, WV 26062

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rover Pipeline LLC (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

4 #1

Memorandum of Law

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#11

(#11) Other Document Proof of Service for Crystal Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#10

(#10) Other Document Proof of Service for Michael Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Temporary Easement(s) to be Condemned filed by Michael C. Thompson. (Guida, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Guida on behalf of All Defendants (Guida, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S #5 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/19. (lmm) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Condemnation (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. For reasons appearing to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the civil matters listed on the attached schedule be TRANSFERRED to and placed on the active docket of the Honorable John Preston Bailey. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 3/19/2019. (kac) (Copy to counsel) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A-Plat

1 #2

Exhibit B-ORDER ISSUING CERTIFICATES

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Any Unknown Owners, ROVER TRACT NO(S). WV-MA-ML-036.000, Crystal M. Thompson, Michael C. Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plat, #2 Exhibit B-ORDER ISSUING CERTIFICATES, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2778041 (njz) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rover Pipeline LLC (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before District Judge John Preston Bailey: Status Conference held on 4/4/2019. (Court Reporter C. Knecht.) (cmd) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Other Document Proof of Service for Crystal Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Dawkins, Lori) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Other Document Proof of Service for Michael Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession of Temporary Easement(s) to be Condemned filed by Michael C. Thompson. (Guida, Daniel) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Guida on behalf of All Defendants (Guida, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING ROVER PIPELINE LLC'S #5 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/22/19. (lmm) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Immediate Access and Possession by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Rover Pipeline LLC of Condemnation (Williams, Lauren) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES. For reasons appearing to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the civil matters listed on the attached schedule be TRANSFERRED to and placed on the active docket of the Honorable John Preston Bailey. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 3/19/2019. (kac) (Copy to counsel) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Any Unknown Owners, ROVER TRACT NO(S). WV-MA-ML-036.000, Crystal M. Thompson, Michael C. Thompson filed by Rover Pipeline LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Plat, #2 Exhibit B-ORDER ISSUING CERTIFICATES, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2778041 (njz) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.