This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:42:29 (UTC).

ROUZIER v. WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCE et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 ROUZIER filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00072

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL ROUZIER

Greencastle, IN 46135

Defendants

CHERYL PETTY

JANE DOE

DUSHAN ZATECKY

PEREZ

AHMAD

JOHN DOE

MICHAEL MITCHEFF

RYANE SCHNDRT

WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCE

CURTIS T. HILL

BRIANT SMITH

SMOOTHERY

TAYLOR FORQUER

CUNNINGHAM

SPANENBERUG

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by RUSSELL ROUZIER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Ten Dollars and Seventeen Cents ($10.17). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through March 11, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/11/2021. (AAS) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit IDOC All Transaction History Report

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RUSSELL ROUZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - IDOC All Transaction History Report). (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AHMAD, CUNNINGHAM, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, TAYLOR FORQUER, CURTIS T. HILL, MICHAEL MITCHEFF, PEREZ, CHERYL PETTY, RYANE SCHNDRT, BRIANT SMITH, SMOOTHERY, SPANENBERUG, WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCE, DUSHAN ZATECKY, filed by RUSSELL ROUZIER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#7) RECEIPT #IP073119 for initial partial filing fee in the amount of $10.17, paid by Plaintiff. (REO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by RUSSELL ROUZIER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AAS) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted to the extent that the plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of Ten Dollars and Seventeen Cents ($10.17). See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The plaintiff shall have through March 11, 2021, in which to pay this sum to the clerk of the district court. The plaintiff is informed that after the initial partial filing fee is paid, he will be obligated to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income each month that the amount in his account exceeds $10.00, until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. After the initial partial filing fee is received, a collection order will be issued to the plaintiff and the plaintiff's custodian, and the Court will screen the complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/11/2021. (AAS) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy distributed to Plaintiff via US mail. (TMC) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff RUSSELL ROUZIER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - IDOC All Transaction History Report). (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AHMAD, CUNNINGHAM, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, TAYLOR FORQUER, CURTIS T. HILL, MICHAEL MITCHEFF, PEREZ, CHERYL PETTY, RYANE SCHNDRT, BRIANT SMITH, SMOOTHERY, SPANENBERUG, WEXFORD MEDICAL SOURCE, DUSHAN ZATECKY, filed by RUSSELL ROUZIER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (AKH) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Medical Sources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. CUNNINGHAM is a litigant

Latest cases where PEREZ is a litigant