This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/01/2022 at 07:34:22 (UTC).

Route Guidance Systems LLC v. Grubhub Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Route Guidance Systems LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Grubhub Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02272

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

Grubhub Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neil A Benchell

Attorney at Devlin Law Firm LLC

815 North Elmwood Avenue

Oak Park, IL 60302

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#5

(#5) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 6/30/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report. In completing the initial status report, please see Appendix (A) to the Local Patent Rules for details on preparing the Initial Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#7

(#7) STATUS Report INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Route Guidance Systems LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Route Guidance Systems LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 6/30/2022. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the initial status hearing and Initial Status Report. In completing the initial status report, please see Appendix (A) to the Local Patent Rules for details on preparing the Initial Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by ROUTE GUIDANCE SYSTEMS LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19403060. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benchell, Neil) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRUBHUB INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil A. Benchell