This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2020 at 08:31:52 (UTC).

Roussel v. Fandango Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Roussel filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Fandango Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stewart D. Aaron and Andrew L. Carter, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00961

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stewart D. Aaron

Presiding Judge

Andrew L. Carter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierre Roussel

Defendant

Fandango Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 301, Suite 305

Valleystream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorneys

Alanna B. Newman

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Ste 1130

New York, NY 10169

Mark Alan Lerner

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Ste 1130

New York, NY 10169

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Tuesday, May 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. In light of recent public health developments, the conference shall be held via telephone. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 5/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/31/2020) (js) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/31/2020) (rj) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Fandango Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Comcast Corporation, Corporate Parent NBCUniversal Fandango Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Warner Media, LLC, Corporate Parent Fixster, Inc., Corporate Parent WB Communications, Inc. for Fandango Media, LLC. Document filed by Fandango Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys that the time for defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint in the above action is extended through and including March 30, 2020. In entering this Stipulation, Defendant Fandango Media, LLC expressly reserves, and waives none, of its rights, arguments or objections in this matter. SO ORDERED. Fandango Media, LLC answer due 3/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/21/2020) (rj) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alanna B. Newman on behalf of Fandango Media, LLC..(Newman, Alanna) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fandango Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Lerner on behalf of Fandango Media, LLC..(Lerner, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Fandango Media, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. Document filed by Pierre Roussel..(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fandango Media, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fandango Media, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Pierre Roussel..(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fandango Media, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18691807)Document filed by Pierre Roussel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fandango Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan B Newman