This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:53 (UTC).

ROUSSEAU v. 3M COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 ROUSSEAU filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against 3M COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17090

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

BRUCE ROUSSEAU

3M COMPANY

Petitioners

IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS

FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A.

Sjunde AP-Fonden

STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND

MP Investment Management A/S

Defendants

MICHAEL F ROMAN

INGE G THULIN

3M COMPANY

NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN DAVID LINDENFELD

Attorney at POMERANTZ LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Petitioner Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER

Attorney at SEEGER WEISS LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

JOSEPH J. DEPALMA

Attorney at LITE, DEPALMA, GREENBERG, LLC

570 Broad Street, Suite 1201

Newark, NJ 07102-5003

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF INSTITUTIONAL INVESTORS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL: Docket Nos. 2:19-cv-15982 and 2:19-cv-17090 are hereby consolidated as In re 3M Company Securities Litigation 19-15982 as master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other action, etc.; the Institutional Investors are Appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiff; the Institutional Investors' selection of Lead Counsel is Approved and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Motley Rice LLC are Appointed to serve as Lead Counsel, etc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/21/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Letter from Seeger Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by MP Investment Management A/S, Sjunde AP-Fonden re #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Non-Opposition of Sjunde AP-Fonden and MP Investment Management A/S (DEPALMA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

5 #3

Text of Proposed Order

5 #2

Brief

5 #1

Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Sjunde AP-Fonden, MP Investment Management A/S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

4 #9

Text of Proposed Order

4 #8

Exhibit F

4 #7

Exhibit E

4 #6

Exhibit D

4 #5

Exhibit C

4 #4

Exhibit B

4 #3

Exhibit A

4 #2

Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger

4 #1

Brief

#4

(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS, FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • ***Civil Case Terminated. (sm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF INSTITUTIONAL INVESTORS FOR CONSOLIDATION OF THE RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL: Docket Nos. 2:19-cv-15982 and 2:19-cv-17090 are hereby consolidated as In re 3M Company Securities Litigation 19-15982 as master file for every action in the consolidated action. The Clerk shall administratively close the other action, etc.; the Institutional Investors are Appointed to serve as Lead Plaintiff; the Institutional Investors' selection of Lead Counsel is Approved and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP and Motley Rice LLC are Appointed to serve as Lead Counsel, etc.. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/21/2019. (sm) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from Seeger Weiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jl, ) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by MP Investment Management A/S, Sjunde AP-Fonden re #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Non-Opposition of Sjunde AP-Fonden and MP Investment Management A/S (DEPALMA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, #5 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (qa, ) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Sjunde AP-Fonden, MP Investment Management A/S. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph J. DePalma, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel by STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, OFFICE OF THE RHODE ISLAND TREASURER ON BEHALF OF THE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, IRON WORKERS LOCAL 580 JOINT FUNDS, FLOSSBACH VON STORCH INVEST S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Christopher A. Seeger, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(SEEGER, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Summons to be Issued by BRUCE ROUSSEAU as to 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN. (LINDENFELD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, NICHOLAS C GANGESTAD, MICHAEL F ROMAN, INGE G THULIN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9913679) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRUCE ROUSSEAU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LINDENFELD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.