This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 10:23:48 (UTC).

Roush v. Aquawood, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Roush filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Aquawood, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross A Walters(R), James E. Gritzner, Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Ross A Walters(R)

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judges

James E. Gritzner

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ammee Roush

Defendants

Chan Ming Yiu

Chan Siu Lun

Liu Yi Man

MGS International LLC

Toy Network L.L.C.

Lisa Liu

Aquawood, L.L.C.

Toy Network Hong Kong

Park Lane Solutions, Ltd.

Toy Quest LTD

Michael Wu

Richard Toth

Brian Dubinsky

Banzai International Ltd.

Manley Toy Direct L.L.C.

Alan Chan

Samson Chan

Dollar Empire LLC

Siu Lun Chan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bruce E Johnson

Attorney at CUTLER LAW FIRM PC

1307 50Th Street

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Stephen A. Weisbrod

Attorney at WEISBROD MATTEIS & COPLEY PLLC

1200 New Hampshire Avenue Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew David Callanan

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Stephen H. Locher

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Mark E Weinhardt

Attorney at THE WEINHARDT LAW FIRM

2600 Grand Avenue, Suite 450

Des Moines, IA 50312

Danielle M Shelton

Attorney at THE WEINHARDT LAW FIRM

2600 Grand Avenue, Suite 450

Des Moines, IA 50312

 

Court Documents

#36

#35

#34

#33

#32

#30

#29

#28

#26

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ammee Roush re #1 Complaint, Acceptance of Secondary Form of Service (Weisbrod, Stephen) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TEXT ORDER granting #34 Defendant Michael Wu's unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Answer and/or Other Response to Complaint. As requested, defendant Michael Wu shall have until July 22, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/25/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and/or Other Response by Michael Wu.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. (Weinhardt, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M Shelton on behalf of Michael Wu (Shelton, Danielle) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E Weinhardt on behalf of Michael Wu (Weinhardt, Mark) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) TEXT ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen A. Weisbrod. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 6/24/2019. (kjw) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Michael Wu served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Weisbrod, Stephen) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3850044 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Ammee Roush. (Johnson, Bruce) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) TEXT ORDER granting #26 Dollar Empire LLC's unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Answer and/or Other Response to Complaint. As requested, defendant Dollar Empire LLC shall have until July 22, 2019, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Plead. As requested, defendants Aquawood, LLC and Brian Dubinsky shall have until July 22, 2019 to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 6/20/2019. (jeb) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Richard Toth served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Johnson, Bruce) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. MGS International LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Johnson, Bruce) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Dollar Empire LLC served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Aquawood, L.L.C. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Toy Network L.L.C. served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Calland, Shelli) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ammee Roush. Manley Toy Direct L.L.C. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Calland, Shelli) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketJudge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Senior Judge James E. Gritzner and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) no longer assigned to case. (don) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 7.1 Packet) (vr) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSenior Judge James E. Gritzner and Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr no longer assigned to case. (kjw) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3804547., filed by Ammee Roush. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 7/25/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Bruce) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Toy Network Hong Kong is a litigant