This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:43:49 (UTC).

Rouser v. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Rouser filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joanne Rouser

Defendant

Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shireen Hormozdi

Attorney at Hormozdi Law Firm

1770 Indian Trail Lilburn Road #175

Norcross, GA 30093

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Set Aside #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Should Defendant seek an extension of time to answer, it should do so by way of a motion that conforms with the Rules of Civil Procedure and local rules, and be filed by an attorney who is admitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 08/13/2019. (ni) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanne Rouser. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4093467), filed by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Set Aside #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Set Deadlines: Case Settlement Deadline 10/15/2019. (ni) Modified file date on 8/19/2019 (ni). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Settlement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Should Defendant seek an extension of time to answer, it should do so by way of a motion that conforms with the Rules of Civil Procedure and local rules, and be filed by an attorney who is admitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 08/13/2019. (ni) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanne Rouser. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4093467), filed by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hormozdi, Shireen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.